Reyes v. Cioccia
Plaintiff: David Reyes
Defendant: Walter A. Cioccia
Case Number: 5:2021cv00451
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 Rule 12 Letter Issued to David Reyes as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Response due by 1/17/2022. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Stouch, L.)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Walter A. Cioccia. (Boyce, R.)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Walter A. Cioccia. (Boyce, R.)
November 23, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
November 23, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #6 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including December 27, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/23/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Walter A. Cioccia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boyce, R.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 USPS Return Receipt - SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Reyes. Walter A. Cioccia served on 11/6/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Walter A. Cioccia. (Summons issued at intake) (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by David Reyes. (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by David Reyes. (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walter A. Cioccia (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number RAL088236), filed by David Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Cioccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter A. Cioccia
Represented By: R. Daniel Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?