Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Educational Data Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Counter Claimant: Educational Data Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00468
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 2/11/22. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/7/2022. (Collins, S.)
December 30, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Educational Data Systems, Inc.. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Educational Data Systems, Inc. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew L. Fitzgerald on behalf of Educational Data Systems, Inc.. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Educational Data Systems, Inc. served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (Lavisky, Matthew)
December 3, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #5 Financial Disclosure Statement. This docket entry was made in the incorrect case. Counsel is directed to refile the document in the correct case. (Collins, S.)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 **DISREGARD - INCORRECT CASE ENTRY** Financial Disclosure Statement by Walter L. Hart, IV Associated Cases: 5:21-cv-00466-FL, 5:21-cv-00468-FL (Monnett, Charles) Modified on 12/3/2021 (Collins, S.).
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Goanos, Theodore)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Theodore Nicholas Goanos on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Goanos, Theodore)
November 22, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2021 SECOND Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
November 19, 2021 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. Chief United States Judge Richard E. Myers II is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 5:21-CV-468-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/19/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Educational Data Systems, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Educational Data Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6316291.), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Goanos, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Educational Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Theodore Nicholas Goanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Educational Data Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?