Human Rights Defense Center v. Skinner Hoekstra et al
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Defendant: Casandra Skinner Hoekstra, Erik A. Hooks, Tim Moose, Darcell Carter, Larry Dunston, Garry Bleeker, Zachary Kendall, North Carolina Department of Public Safety, Doug Pardue and Does 1-30
Case Number: 5:2021cv00469
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Complaint, filed by Garry Bleeker, Darcell Carter, Larry Dunston, Erik A. Hooks, Tim Moose, North Carolina Department of Public Safety, Casandra Skinner Hoekstra. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Trachtman, James)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Daniel L. Marshall on behalf of Human Rights Defense Center. (Marshall, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Complaint. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and (c). (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #7 Complaint. This document contains the names of numerous counsel listed as "pro hac vice". Counsel is advised to review Local Civil Rule 83.1 (e) with regard to procedures for special appearances by attorneys not admitted in the Eastern District of North Carolina. (Collins, S.)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 04176315990.), filed by Human Rights Defense Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Improper Censorship) (Simpson, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/3/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Appearance Local 83.1 Counsel filed by Elizabeth Guild Simpson on behalf of Human Rights Defense Center. (Simpson, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/22/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Garry Bleeker, Darcell Carter, Larry Dunston, Erik A. Hooks, Zachary Kendall, Tim Moose, North Carolina Department of Public Safety, Doug Pardue, Casandra Skinner Hoekstra. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SECOND Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 5:21-CV-469-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/16/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Richard E. Myers II, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:21-CV-469-M. No further filing shall be made in 4:21-CV-170-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/15/2021. (Sellers, N.) Modified on 11/19/2021 (Collins, S.).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel is directed to refile because the attachment/exhibit (page 27) should be filed as separate pdf attached to the main document. See Section V.E.1(d) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - The address information in the signature block for Elizabeth Guild Simpson on the complaint does not match the information that the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel should email the updated law firm information to the clerk's office at NCED-AttomeyUpdate@nced.uscourts.gov. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-2] Proposed Summons Skinner Hoekstra, [1-3Proposed Summons Carter, [1-4] Proposed Summons Pardue, [1-5] Proposed Summons Hooks, [1-6] Proposed Summons Bleeker, [1-7] Proposed Summons Dunston, [1-8] Proposed Summons Moose, [1-9] Proposed Summons Kendall, [1-10] Proposed Summons North Carolina Department of Public of Safety. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet and the proposed summons) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 11/15/2021. Old Case Number 4:21-cv-170. (Sellers, N.)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Related Case filed by Human Rights Defense Center . (Simpson, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Human Rights Defense Center identifying Corporate Parent Human Rights Defense Center for Human Rights Defense Center. (Simpson, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6315990.), filed by Human Rights Defense Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Skinner Hoekstra Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Carter Summons, #4 Proposed Summons Pardue Summons, #5 Proposed Summons Hooks Summons, #6 Proposed Summons Bleeker Summons, #7 Proposed Summons Dunston Summons, #8 Proposed Summons Moose Summons, #9 Proposed Summons Kendall Summons, #10 Proposed Summons North Carolina Department of Public of Safety Summons) (Simpson, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Human Rights Defense Center v. Skinner Hoekstra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Represented By: Elizabeth Guild Simpson
Represented By: Daniel L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casandra Skinner Hoekstra
Represented By: James B. Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik A. Hooks
Represented By: James B. Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Moose
Represented By: James B. Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcell Carter
Represented By: James B. Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Dunston
Represented By: James B. Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Bleeker
Represented By: James B. Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: James B. Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Pardue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?