Scardina v. Goodacre et al
Plaintiff: John Michael Scardina
Defendant: Robert Goodacre, Justin Hastings, Jeffrey Garrett, Jr., Justin Velez, State of North Carolina and Town of Franklinton
Case Number: 5:2021cv00504
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 24 Rule 12 Letter Issued to John Michael Scardina as to #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 2/18/2022. Copy sent via US Mail to John Michael Scardina at General Post Office, Rolesville, North Carolina. (Stouch, L.)
January 25, 2022 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support regarding #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez. (Hartzog, Dan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FBI Law Enforcement Bulletin) (Hartzog, Dan)
January 21, 2022 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by John Michael Scardina. (Stouch, L.)
January 21, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Self-Representation filed by John Michael Scardina (Stouch, L.)
January 21, 2022 Filing 19 Document: Writ of Error - Quae Coram Nobis Residant filed by John Michael Scardina. (Attachments: #1 Attached Order) (Stouch, L.)
January 3, 2022 Filing 18 Mail sent to John Michael Scardina Returned as Undeliverable. (Stouch, L.)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Robert Goodacre answer due 2/28/2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/3/2021. Copy sent via US Mail to John Michael Scardina at General Post Office, Rolesville, North Carolina. (Stouch, L.)
December 28, 2021 Filing 16 Mail sent to John Michael Scardina Returned as Undeliverable. (Stouch, L.)
December 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Robert Goodacre. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Milholland, John)
December 28, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by John Locke Milholland, IV on behalf of Robert Goodacre. (Milholland, John)
December 28, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, and Justin Velez answers due 1/17/2022. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/16/2021. Copy sent via US Mail to John Michael Scardina at General Post Office, Rolesville, North Carolina. (Stouch, L.) Modified on 12/16/2021 to correct docket entry text (Stouch, L.).
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 Document: Mailing Address Instructions filed by John Michael Scardina. (Stouch, L.)
December 16, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 Notice filed by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 Notice filed by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement for Pro Se Plaintiff to file a Notice of Self-Representation and to file a Financial Disclosure Statement and for counsel for defendant Robert Goodacre to file a Notice of Appearancemake a Notice of Appearance. A blank notice of self-representation and financial disclosure statement mailed via US Mail to John Michael Scardina at General Post-Office, Rolesville, NC 27571 and to John Michael Scardina at 1329 Lagerfeld Way, Wake Forest, NC 27587 and to defense counsel J. Locke Milholland, IV at PO Box 31501, Raleigh, NC 27622 mailed via US mail on December 10, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
December 10, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
December 10, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Town of Franklinton (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Justin Velez (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Justin Hastings (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr on behalf of Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez. (Hartzog, Dan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine Barber-Jones on behalf of Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez. (Barber-Jones, Katherine)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez from Franklin County Superior Court, case number 21-cvs-967. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6350274), filed by Jeffrey Garrett, Jr, Justin Hastings, Town of Franklinton, Justin Velez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Scardina Service Information, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Barber-Jones, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scardina v. Goodacre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Scardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Goodacre
Represented By: John Locke Milholland, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hastings
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Garrett, Jr.
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Velez
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Franklinton
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?