Jackson v. Red.com et al
Plaintiff: William G. Jackson, III
Defendant: Red.com, Bob Castillini, Freedom Processing, LLC and Major League Baseball
Case Number: 5:2021cv00513
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding #1 Complaint filed by William G. Jackson, III. It is RECOMMENDED that this matter be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff shall have until February 11, 2022, to file written objections to the Memorandum and Recommendation. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 1/24/2022. (Copy of M&R sent to William G. Jackson, III, 307 Ward Ave., Bellevue, KY 41073 via US Mail.)(Waddell, K.)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER regarding #1 Complaint. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents by January 10, 2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 12/22/2021. (Copy of order and forms sent to William G. Jackson, III, 307 Ward Ave., Bellevue, KY 41073 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned as to the Honorable Richard E. Myers II, Chief United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents should reflect the revised case number of 5:21-CV-513-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/16/2021. Copy sent via US Mail to William G. Jackson, III, 307 Ward Ave., Bellevue, KY 41073. (Stouch, L.)
December 15, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuantto Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
December 15, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to William G. Jackson, III. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (No Filing fee Paid), filed by William G. Jackson, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Red.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Castillini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Processing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major League Baseball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?