Byrd v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Michelle Mckoy Byrd
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv00527
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 Receipt (RAL089609) - Civil Filing Fee. (Waddell, K.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Michelle Mckoy Byrd. regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michelle Mckoy Byrd (Piemonte, George)
January 10, 2022 Document Referred: #4 Withdrawal of Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II. (Waddell, K.)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order: The court will hold a hearing on plaintiffs IFP motion on Tuesday, January 11, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. The hearing will take place by videoconference. The Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiffs counsel with the necessary information to participate in the hearing. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 1/4/2022. Entered by United States Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II (Brewer, C)
December 28, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Waddell, K.)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michelle Mckoy Byrd (Piemonte, George)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by George C. Piemonte on behalf of Michelle Mckoy Byrd. (Piemonte, George)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Michelle Mckoy Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 USM 285 Forms) (Piemonte, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Mckoy Byrd
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?