Gause v. Vonn et al
Plaintiff: Walter Timothy Gause
Defendant: Warden Vonn, Captain Stockley, Lieutenant Lassiter and Sergeant Zimmer
Case Number: 5:2022ct03049
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 16 Letter from plaintiff requesting copies. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DE 12, 13, 14, and docket sheet mailed with postage provided.) (Castania, M)
March 16, 2022 Filing 15 Letter from plaintiff enclosing stamps. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Copy of complaint mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
March 15, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #14 MOTION for Leave to File Documentation. (Castania, M)
March 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Documentation filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Grievances, #2 Envelope) (Castania, M)
March 8, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Castania, M)
March 8, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Castania, M)
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
March 7, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #12 MOTION to Amend. (Castania, M)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from plaintiff requesting copies. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Response Letter) (Castania, M)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/24/2022. Copy served via US Mail on plaintiff and on NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
February 24, 2022 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
February 24, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Castania, M)
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Walter Timothy Gause. (Castania, M)
February 23, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 Document: Consent to Collection of Fees from Inmate Trust Fund Account filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 2/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/4/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to plaintiff regarding filing of complaint and enclosing notice regarding privacy issues. (Castania, M)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Indig, A.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Indig, A.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Indig, A.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lieutenant Lassiter, Captain Stockley, Warden Vonn and Sergeant Zimmer filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gause v. Vonn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Timothy Gause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Vonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Stockley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?