Campbell v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Stephanie Campbell
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2022cv00005
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 9 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 2/1/22. (Stouch, L.)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kilolo Kijakazi on 1/31/22. (Stouch, L.)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 USM 285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Kilolo Kijakazi served on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/3/2022. (Stouch, L.)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Stouch, L.)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Stephanie Campbell. (Stouch, L.)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 1/6/2022. (Stouch, L.)
January 6, 2022 Remark - Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Stouch, L.)
January 5, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Campbell (Hall, Charlotte)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Stephanie Campbell. (Hall, Charlotte)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Stephanie Campbell. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)
January 4, 2022 Notice of Social Security Case Filing. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Campbell
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?