United States of America v. $66,899.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $66,899 in U.S. Currency and $66,899.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Sami Nagi
Case Number: 5:2022cv00034
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981 Civil Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Sami Nagi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pruden, William)
March 9, 2022 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
March 9, 2022 TEXT ORDER granting Claimant's Motion for Extension of Time #8 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Claimant has up to and including April 18, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #2 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/9/2022. (Hockaday, A.)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 CLAIM Verified by Sami Nagi. (Attachments: #1 Index TO EXHIBITS, #2 Exhibit Notarized document from Sami Nagis business partner) (Pruden, William)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by William C. Pruden on behalf of Sami Nagi. (Pruden, William)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/21/2022. (Sellers, N.)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Refiled with Declaration) against $66,899 in U.S. Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Special Agent Jahaira Torrens, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 REFILED AT DE #2 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $66,899 in U.S. Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 1/21/2022 to reflect that corrected complaint was filed at #2 . (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $66,899.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $66,899 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $66,899.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sami Nagi
Represented By: William C. Pruden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?