Allen v. City of Dunn et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS E ALLEN and Thomas E. Allen
Defendant: City of Dunn, TRAE GONZALES and APPELLES HART
Case Number: 5:2022cv00114
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 2/4/23. Mediation Deadline set for 2/15/23. Motions due by 4/4/23. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/13/22. (Collins, S.)
May 13, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. The parties have agreed to select a mediator and must file their Selection of Mediator electronically on or before 7/15/2022. (Collins, S.)
May 11, 2022 Filing 19 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Thomas E. Allen. (Fritts, Spencer)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/23/22. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/18/2022. (Collins, S.)
April 12, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan D. Oxendine on behalf of Thomas E. Allen. (Oxendine, Ryan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Barnes, IV on behalf of Thomas E. Allen. (Barnes, James)
April 12, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Spencer S. Fritts on behalf of Thomas E. Allen. (Fritts, Spencer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Spencer S. Fritts on behalf of Thomas E. Allen. (Fritts, Spencer)
April 12, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #14 Notice of Appearance. Counsel failed to flatten the PDF after creating it as required pursuant to Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel is directed to refile the document making sure to comply with the rule. (Waddell, K.)
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Norman Charles Post, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Post, Norman)
April 11, 2022 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Notice of Appearance, #11 Notice of Appearance, #12 Notice of Appearance. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
April 11, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #12 Notice of Appearance. This document is signed by attorney Spencer Fritts however is filed by attorney James Barnes. Counsel shall revise and refile. (Collins, S.)
April 11, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #9 Notice of Appearance. Counsel's signature line does not comply with Section IV.D.1 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual.The signature line should read "/s/ Norman Charles Post, Jr." Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
April 6, 2022 Filing 12 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #16 ** Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Barnes, IV on behalf of Thomas E. Allen. (Barnes, James) Modified on 4/15/2022 (Collins, S.). (Main Document 12 flattened and replaced on 4/15/2022) (Edwards, S.).
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #17 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Oxendine on behalf of Thomas E. Allen. (Oxendine, Ryan) Modified on 4/15/2022 (Collins, S.).
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #15 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Spencer S. Fritts on behalf of Thomas E. Allen. (Fritts, Spencer) Modified on 4/15/2022 (Collins, S.). (Main Document 10 flattened and replaced on 4/15/2022) (Edwards, S.).
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #13 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Norman Charles Post, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Post, Norman) Modified on 4/15/2022 (Collins, S.).
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses by City of Dunn, Trae Gonzales, Appelles Hart. (Gessner, Paul)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice filed by City of Dunn, Trae Gonzales, Appelles Hart regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Gessner, Paul)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Norman C. Post, III of Post Foushee Patton at 205 Courtland Dr., Sanford, NC 27331-1320 mailed via US Mail on 3/28/2022. (Rudd, D.)
March 28, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
March 28, 2022 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
March 25, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by APPELLES HART (Gessner, Paul)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by TRAE GONZALES (Gessner, Paul)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Dunn (Gessner, Paul)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul Gerard Gessner on behalf of All Defendants. (Gessner, Paul)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by APPELLES HART, TRAE GONZALES, City of Dunn from NC Superior Court, Harnett County, case number 22-cvs-359. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6491469), filed by APPELLES HART, TRAE GONZALES, City of Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summonses and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gessner, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. City of Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS E ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Allen
Represented By: James A. Barnes, IV
Represented By: Norman Charles Post, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan D. Oxendine
Represented By: Spencer S. Fritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dunn
Represented By: Paul Gerard Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAE GONZALES
Represented By: Paul Gerard Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPELLES HART
Represented By: Paul Gerard Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?