Briggs v. Juul Labs Inc.
Plaintiff: Grace Briggs
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00121
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn F. Abernethy on behalf of Grace Briggs. (Abernethy, Kathryn)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/27/2022. (Sellers, N.)
April 27, 2022 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Schenk, Edward)
April 20, 2022 Filing 31 Financial Disclosure Statement by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Schenk, Edward)
April 20, 2022 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JUUL Labs, Inc. answer due 4/28/2022. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/18/2022. Sent to Gregory George Paul of Paul Law Offices at 1808 Wedemeyer Street, Suite 216, San Francisco, CA 94129 and James A. Bell, IV and Christopher A. Macey, Jr. of Bell & Bell LLP at 1617 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1254, Philadelphia, PA 19103 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
April 15, 2022 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
April 14, 2022 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Schenk, Edward)
April 14, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance filed by Edward S. Schenk on behalf of JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Schenk, Edward)
March 31, 2022 Filing 27 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
March 31, 2022 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of California Northern. Case Number 3:21-cv-08811. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #10 Motion to Transfer. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held and recorded by Zoom videoconference on 3/17/2022 re #10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The motion was argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (Digital Recording Time: 9:05-9:18)Attorneys for Plaintiff: James Bell/Gregory PaulAttorneys for Defendant: Patrick Sherman/Daniel Lassen (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Michael Sherman (Sherman, Patrick) (Filed on 3/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Eric Lassen (Lassen, Daniel) (Filed on 3/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING BY ZOOM. Please take notice the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for March 3, 2022 is continued to March 17, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 16, 2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.

February 4, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) filed byJuul Labs Inc.. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 2/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #13 Motion to change the time for compliance with General Order 71. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 28, 2022 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) filed byGrace Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Briggs, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Briggs Declaration, #3 Declaration Paul, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to Paul Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Paul, Gregory) (Filed on 1/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Bell, IV. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Macey. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by James A. Bell, IV ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16845574.) filed by Grace Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bell, James) (Filed on 1/27/2022)[Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher A. Macey, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16845491.) filed by Grace Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Macey, Christopher) (Filed on 1/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 DEFENDANT JUUL LABS, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CHANGE TIME FOR COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 71, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-3 filed by Juul Labs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN L. JOHNSRUD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JUUL LABS, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CHANGE TIME FOR COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 71, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-3, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JUUL LABS, INCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CHANGE TIME FOR COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 71, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-3)(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 1/21/2022) Modified on 1/24/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Please take notice the case management conference set for February 10, 2022 is continued to March 3, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Paul, Gregory) (Filed on 1/20/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Juul Labs Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/28/2022. Replies due by 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL LASSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JUUL LABS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DON TROUPE JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JUUL LABS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF JOANNA ENGELKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JUUL LABS, INC.S MOTION DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #4 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JUUL LABS, INCS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Juul Labs Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs Inc.. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juul Labs Inc... (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 1/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2022 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Grace Briggs.. (Paul, Gregory) (Filed on 12/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Grace Briggs. Service waived by Juul Labs Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2021, answer due 1/14/2022. (Paul, Gregory) (Filed on 12/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by December 20, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2022 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2021. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Grace Briggs . (Paul, Gregory) (Filed on 11/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Juul Labs Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ACANDC-16622472). Filed by Grace Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paul, Gregory) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]
November 12, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover sheet is blank and or missing. Please refile just the civil cover sheet. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Compl aint filed by Grace Briggs (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Juul Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Briggs
Represented By: James A Bell, IV
Represented By: Christopher Alan Macey, Jr
Represented By: Gregory George Paul
Represented By: Kathryn F. Abernethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Lee Johnsrud
Represented By: Daniel Eric Lassen
Represented By: Patrick Michael Sherman
Represented By: Edward S. Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?