Bowser v. CREE, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Bowser
Defendant: CREE, Inc., The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines and The Cree Inc. Severance Program
Counter Claimant: The Amended and Restated Severance Program
Case Number: 5:2022cv00134
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Robert Bowser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Krasner, Joshua)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #23 MOTION to Remand filed by CREE, Inc., CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program), The Amended and Restated Severance Program, The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines. (Lindahl, Rebecca)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #18 Counterclaim. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff's request for an Order staying Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendants' Counterclaims until ten (10) days following this Court's disposition of the Motion to Remand, but only in the event that the Court denies the Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/19/2022. (Stouch, L.)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Robert Bowser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Barrett, William)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Memorandum in Support regarding #23 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Bowser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTD, Cree's Answer and Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit Cree Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Cree Brief in Support of MSJ, #4 Exhibit 2/16/22 Email, #5 Exhibit 2/24/22 Email, #6 Exhibit Motion to Amend Complaint) (Krasner, Joshua)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Bowser. (Krasner, Joshua)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Fifth Claim for Relief by Robert Bowser (Krasner, Joshua)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/21/2022. (Stouch, L.)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CREE, Inc., CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program), The Amended and Restated Severance Program, The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines. (Lindahl, Rebecca)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #18 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim. CM/ECF does not accommodate certain document combinations, such as 'response and reply' or 'answer and motion'. A separate motion to dismiss should be filed so it shows as a pending motion on the docket to receive a ruling from the Court. (Stouch, L.)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order REMINDER TO COUNSEL. Pursuant to Judge Boyle's #Practice Preferences located on the court's website, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. (Stouch, L.)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Memorandum in Support regarding #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CREE, Inc., CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program), The Amended and Restated Severance Program, The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Requests for Production (excerpt), #2 Unpublished Cases) (Lindahl, Rebecca) Modified on 4/21/2022 to correct docket entry text.
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint , Motion to Dismiss, COUNTERCLAIM against Robert Bowser by The Amended and Restated Severance Program, CREE, Inc., The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines, CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Severance Plan, #2 Exhibit B- Redacted Offer Letter, #3 Exhibit C- Offer letter with Date, #4 Exhibit D- Stock Option Award Agreements, #5 Exhibit E Stock Option Award Agreement T&C, #6 Exhibit F- RSU Agreements, #7 Exhibit G- RSU Agreement T&C) (Lindahl, Rebecca)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by William P. Barrett on behalf of Robert Bowser. (Barrett, William)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua M. Krasner on behalf of Robert Bowser. (Krasner, Joshua)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants' answer due 4/20/2022. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/13/2022. Copy sent by US Mail to William P. Barrett and Joshua M. Krasner of Barrett Law Offices, PLLC at 5 West Hargett Street, Suite 910, Raleigh, NC 27601. (Stouch, L.)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by CREE, Inc., CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program), The Amended and Restated Severance Program, The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lindahl, Rebecca)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program) (Panizzolo, Kelsey)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Amended and Restated Severance Program identifying Corporate Parent CREE, Inc. for The Amended and Restated Severance Program. (Panizzolo, Kelsey)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Cree Inc. Severance Program identifying Corporate Parent CREE, Inc. for The Cree Inc. Severance Program. (Panizzolo, Kelsey)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines identifying Corporate Parent CREE, Inc. for The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines. (Panizzolo, Kelsey)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by CREE, Inc. (Panizzolo, Kelsey)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Kelsey R. Panizzolo on behalf of All Defendants. (Panizzolo, Kelsey)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Michaela Connors Holcombe on behalf of All Defendants. (Holcombe, Michaela)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca Kinlein Lindahl on behalf of All Defendants. (Lindahl, Rebecca)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca Kinlein Lindahl on behalf of CREE, Inc., CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program), The Amended and Restated Severance Program, The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines. (Lindahl, Rebecca)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice filed by CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program), The Amended and Restated Severance Program, The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines regarding #1 Notice of Removal Joinder to Notice of Removal. (Lindahl, Rebecca)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice filed by CREE, Inc., CREE, Inc.(in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Cree Severance Pay Guidelines, Cree Inc. Severance Program and/or Amended and Restated Severance Program), The Amended and Restated Severance Program, The Cree Inc. Severance Program, The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines regarding #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lindahl, Rebecca)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, William P. Barrett and Joshua M. Krasner of Barrett Law Offices, PLLC at 5 West Hargett Street, Suite 910, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on April 7, 2022. (Rudd, D.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to CREE, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CREE, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6508102), filed by CREE, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal) (Lindahl, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowser v. CREE, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bowser
Represented By: William P. Barrett
Represented By: Joshua M. Krasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREE, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Kinlein Lindahl
Represented By: Kelsey R. Panizzolo
Represented By: Michaela Connors Holcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cree, Inc. Severance Pay Guidelines
Represented By: Kelsey R. Panizzolo
Represented By: Michaela Connors Holcombe
Represented By: Rebecca Kinlein Lindahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cree Inc. Severance Program
Represented By: Kelsey R. Panizzolo
Represented By: Michaela Connors Holcombe
Represented By: Rebecca Kinlein Lindahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: The Amended and Restated Severance Program
Represented By: Kelsey R. Panizzolo
Represented By: Michaela Connors Holcombe
Represented By: Rebecca Kinlein Lindahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?