Grayer v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Annette Grayer
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2022cv00149
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Affidavit of Service filed by Annette Grayer served on Kilolo Kijakazi, Merrick Garland, and Michael F. Easley, Jr. on 05/05/2022. (Hall, Charlotte)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Annette Grayer (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number RAL091543). (Sellers, N.)
April 28, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number RAL091543 (Sellers, N.)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffmay tender to the clerk the filing fee of $402.00 no later than May 27, 2022. If the plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee in the allotted time, the clerk shall close the matter without further order from the court. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/25/2022. (Sellers, N.)
April 20, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
April 20, 2022 Notice of Social Security Case Filing (Sellers, N.)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Annette Grayer (Hall, Charlotte)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Annette Grayer. (Hall, Charlotte)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Annette Grayer. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayer v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Grayer
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?