Estate of Madison Rose Mergl v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Madison Rose Mergl
Defendant: Tiffany Victoria Lee, Larry Beddingfield, Larry Beddingfield & Sons Trucking, ButterballLLC, Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc., Kennedy Brothers, Inc. and Butterball LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00218
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 1471 Federal Aviation Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #28 MOTION to Remand filed by Estate of Madison Rose Mergl. (Doggett, Eric)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Declaration regarding #34 Response in Opposition to Motion by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc. filed by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Broker-Contract Owner Oper Agmt, #2 Exhibit Carrier Rate Confirmation) (Losee, Geoffrey)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #28 MOTION to Remand filed by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.. (Losee, Geoffrey)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Consent MOTION to Stay regarding #25 Order, Set Deadlines, until ruling on motion to remand. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/7/2022. (Collins, S.)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #32 Consent MOTION to Stay regarding #25 Order, Set Deadlines, until ruling on motion to remand. (Collins, S.)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Consent MOTION to Stay regarding #25 Order,, Set Deadlines, until ruling on motion to remand filed by Estate of Madison Rose Mergl. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Doggett, Eric)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Preston William Rollero on behalf of Butterball LLC. (Rollero, Preston)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Appearance filed by Claude Rob Wilson on behalf of Butterball LLC. (Wilson, Claude)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Memorandum in Support regarding #28 MOTION to Remand filed by Estate of Madison Rose Mergl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CH Robinson v Miller, US Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - CH Robinson v Miller, US Brief certIficate of service) (Doggett, Eric)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Remand filed by Estate of Madison Rose Mergl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lee Summons Return, #2 Exhibit B - Lee Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Beddingfield Summons Return, #4 Exhibit D - ECF Attorneys Query - Mergl, #5 Exhibit E - ECF Attorneys Query - Wray) (Doggett, Eric)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY/ ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Kennedy Brothers, Inc. by Larry Beddingfield. (Kelly, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY/ ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim of Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc. by Larry Beddingfield. (Kelly, Christopher)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 7/21/22. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/16/2022. (Collins, S.)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel. Counsel is reminded that the judge designation has changed and the case number should read 5:22-cv-00218-FL. (Collins, S.)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tiffany Victoria Lee. (MacRae, Samuel)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tiffany Victoria Lee (MacRae, Samuel)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel H. MacRae on behalf of Tiffany Victoria Lee. (MacRae, Samuel)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Estate of Madison Rose Mergl (Doggett, Eric)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric Laurence Doggett on behalf of Estate of Madison Rose Mergl. (Doggett, Eric)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Larry Beddingfield. Amendment to #17 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #16 Notice of Appearance, #18 Financial Disclosure Statement Amended Certificate of Service (Kelly, Christopher)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Larry Beddingfield (Kelly, Christopher)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Larry Beddingfield d/b/a Larry Beddingfield & Sons Trucking. (Kelly, Christopher) Modified on 6/8/2022 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Kelly on behalf of Larry Beddingfield d/b/a Larry Beddingfield & Sons Trucking. (Kelly, Christopher) Modified on 6/8/2022 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #16 Notice of Appearance. The attorney information in the signature block does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel is directed to update contact information in CM/ECF by choosing "Utilities" and selecting "Maintain Your Account." Contact the clerk's office if additional assistance is required. (Collins, S.)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the continued efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Richard E. Myers II is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 5:22-CV-218-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/6/2022. (Hockaday, A.)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kennedy Brothers, Inc. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Hayes Overmann on behalf of Kennedy Brothers, Inc.. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Defendant Kennedy Brothers, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Larry Beddingfield & Sons Trucking, Tiffany Victoria Lee by Kennedy Brothers, Inc.. (Overmann, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Larry Beddingfield, Tiffany Victoria Lee by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.. (Losee, Geoffrey)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Butterball LLC identifying Corporate Parent BB Kansas Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Maxwell Farms, LLC for Butterball LLC. (Wall, F.)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Butterball LLC. (Wall, F.)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by F. Marshall Wall on behalf of Butterball LLC. (Wall, F.)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by James C. Thornton on behalf of Butterball LLC. (Thornton, James)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice filed by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal,,, as filed with State Court. (Losee, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Billy Strickland, II of Strickland Agner Pittman at 112 North William Street, Goldsboro, NC 27530; Counsel for defendant Butterball, LLC, Marshall Wall of Cranfill Sumner at 5420 Wade Park Blvd., Suite 300, Raleigh, NC 27607; Counsel for defendant Kennedy Brothers, Inc., Elizabeth Overmann of McAngus Goudelock & Courie, PLLC at P. O. Box 30516, Raleigh, NC 27622; Counsel for Defendant Tiffany Lee, Samuel MacRae of MacRae Law Firm PLLC at 307 N. Fifth Ave., Wilmington, NC 28401 and Counsel for defendant Larry Benningfield d/b/a Beddingfield & Sons Trucking, Christopher Kelly of Gallivan, White & Boyd P.A. at P. O. Box 12250, Charlotte, NC 28220 mailed via US Mail on June 1, 2022. (Rudd, D.)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc. (Losee, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-13] Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Pardis Camarda on behalf of Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.. (Camarda, Pardis)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice filed by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc. Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Losee, Geoffrey)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Geoffrey A. Losee on behalf of Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.. (Losee, Geoffrey)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc. from Wayne County Superior Court, case number 2022-CVS-360. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6579667), filed by Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint Mergl, #3 Exhibit Summons to Lee and Beddingfield, #4 Exhibit Summons to Butterball and Kennedy Brothers Inc., #5 Exhibit Summons to Kennedy Brothers Logistics, #6 Exhibit A&P to Lee and Beddingfield, #7 Exhibit A&P to Butterball and KBI, #8 Exhibit A&P to KBL, #9 Exhibit Overmann Ltr to Clerk, #10 Exhibit Return of Service for KBI, #11 Exhibit Return of Service for KBL, #12 Exhibit Affidavit of Service for Butterball, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (Losee, Geoffrey) (Attachment 13 flattened and replaced on 6/27/2022) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Madison Rose Mergl v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Madison Rose Mergl
Represented By: Eric Laurence Doggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Victoria Lee
Represented By: Samuel H. MacRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Beddingfield
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Beddingfield & Sons Trucking
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ButterballLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Brothers Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Pardis Camarda
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Losee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hayes Overmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butterball LLC
Represented By: Claude Rob Wilson
Represented By: F. Marshall Wall
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Represented By: Preston William Rollero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?