Carr et al v. North Carolina State Board of Elections
Plaintiff: Lent Christopher Carr, II, Isaac Jenkins, Angela M. Schwarz, Harley Johnson and Concerned Citizens for Community Action
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Elections
Case Number: 5:2022cv00353
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 23 Rule 12 Letter Issued Plaintiffs as to #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 11/6/2022. (Collins, S.)
October 13, 2022 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support regarding #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index, #2 Exhibit A Mandamus Petition, #3 Exhibit B Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit C Affidavit of Katelyn Love, #5 Exhibit D Order denying Motion to Stay, #6 Exhibit E Dismissal Order, #7 Exhibit F Notice of Appeal, #8 Exhibit G NC COA Orders) (Babb, Mary)
October 13, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Babb, Mary)
October 13, 2022 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina State Board of Elections (Babb, Mary)
October 13, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary Carla Babb on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Babb, Mary)
October 13, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Steed, Terence)
September 26, 2022 Filing 17 Document: Duplicate copy of DE15 - Now Signed Motion to Expedite filed by Lent Christopher Carr, II, Concerned Citizens for Community Action, Isaac Jenkins, Harley Johnson, Angela M. Schwarz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope, #3 Return envelope) (Collins, S.)
September 26, 2022 Filing 16 Document: Duplicate copy of DE14 - Now Signed Motion to Consolidate filed by Lent Christopher Carr, II, Concerned Citizens for Community Action, Isaac Jenkins, Harley Johnson, Angela M. Schwarz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, S.)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding motion to consolidate DE #14 and motion to expedite DE #15 . Where plaintiffs have not filed a motion for preliminary injunction in accordance with the court's local civil rules 7.1 and 7.2, the instant motions to expedite and to consolidate hearing on preliminary injunction with trial on the merits are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/26/2022. Copy of this Text Order was sent via US mail to all pro se plaintiffs. (Collins, S.)
September 22, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #15 Motion to Expedite. A non-filing user cannot electronically sign a document such as an affidavit or declaration with an "/s/", but must instead manually sign the document. See Section IV(D)(3) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Copy of this NOD was sent via US mail to all pro se plaintiffs. (Collins, S.)
September 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite Case, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction with a Trial on the Merits, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 13 Proof of Service with estimated delivery date of 9/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Fed Ex Receipt) (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Isaac Jenkins. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Isaac Jenkins. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Harley Johnson. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Harley Johnson. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Concerned Citizens for Community Action. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Concerned Citizens for Community Action. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Angela M. Schwarz. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Angela M. Schwarz. (McNally, Kimberly)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Summons issued at intake.) (Rudd, D.)
September 7, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). Harley Johnson, Angela M. Schwarz, Isaac Jenkins, Concerned Citizens for Community Action shall file a Notice of Self-Representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
September 7, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Concerned Citizens for Community Action, Isaac Jenkins, Harley Johnson, Angela M. Schwarz. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 6, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Lent Christopher Carr, II. (Rudd, D.)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Lent Christopher Carr, II. (Rudd, D.)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Carolina State Board of Elections (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number RAL094054.), filed by Harley Johnson, Lent Christopher Carr, II, Angela M. Schwarz, Isaac Jenkins, Concerned Citizens for Community Action. (Attachments: #1 A copy of from the North Carolina Court of Appeals - Tenth District, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr et al v. North Carolina State Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lent Christopher Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concerned Citizens for Community Action
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?