Devito v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Devito
Defendant: Biomet, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Robert Vavrina, North Carolina Distributors, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv00185
Filed: April 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Brian S Meyers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Zimmer Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Durom Cup Claims Based on the Statute of Repose filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Packer, Leslie)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Zimmer, Inc. on 03/09/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Zimmer Holdings, Inc. on 03/09/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. on 03/09/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Robert Vavrina on 03/11/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Biomet, Inc. on 03/09/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC on 03/09/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Biomet Orthopedics, LLC on 03/09/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Thomas Devito served on Biomet Manufacturing, LLC on 03/09/2023. (Abrams, Douglas)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Vavrina ONLY filed by Thomas Devito. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Abrams, Douglas)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Zimmer Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Durom Cup Claims Based on the Statute of Repose filed by Thomas Devito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Abrams, Douglas)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Thomas Devito (Abrams, Douglas)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas B. Abrams on behalf of Thomas Devito. (Abrams, Douglas)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice filed by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Robert Vavrina, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal,,, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court) (Pfefferle, Madeleine)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Memorandum in Support regarding #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Robert Vavrina. (Packer, Leslie)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Robert Vavrina. (Packer, Leslie)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Defendant Vavrina's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Vavrina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of R. Vavrina) (Packer, Leslie)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum in Support regarding #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Vavrina's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fraud Claim filed by Robert Vavrina. (Packer, Leslie)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Vavrina's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fraud Claim filed by Robert Vavrina. (Packer, Leslie)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Biomet Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Packer, Leslie)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Zimmer Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Durom Cup Claims Based on the Statute of Repose filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Packer, Leslie)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Zimmer Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Durom Cup Claims Based on the Statute of Repose filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Packer, Leslie)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel, Douglas B. Abrams of Abrams & Abrams, P.A. at 1526 Glenwood Avenue, Raleigh, NC 27608; Navan Ward, Jr., Aigner Kolom, Tiffany Birley and David Byrne, III of Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis, & Miles, P.C. at P. O. Box 4160, Montgomery, AL 36103 mailed via US Mail on April 13, 2023. (Rudd, D.)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer US, Inc., Corporate Parent Zimmer, Inc., Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Vavrina (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Zimmer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for Zimmer, Inc.. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Holdings, Inc. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Biomet Orthopedics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer US, Inc., Corporate Parent Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Corporate Parent Zimmer, Inc., Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer, Inc., Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent LVB Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent ZB Manufacturing, LLC, Corporate Parent Biomet, Inc. for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Biomet, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer, Inc., Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent LVB Acquisition, Inc. for Biomet, Inc.. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Madeleine Pfefferle on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Robert Vavrina, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Pfefferle, Madeleine)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Robert Vavrina, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Packer, Leslie)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Robert Vavrina, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7033789), filed by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Robert Vavrina, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court's File, #4 Exhibit B - IN SOS Biomet Orthopedics, #5 Exhibit C - IN SOS Zimmer US, #6 Exhibit D - IN SOS Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, #7 Exhibit E - IN SOS Biomet Manufacturing, #8 Exhibit F - Vavrina Declaration in Support) (Packer, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devito v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Devito
Represented By: Douglas B. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vavrina
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Madeleine Pfefferle
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?