Ussery v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Monica Faith Ussery
Defendant: Roy Cooper, Erik A. Hooks, Lorrin Freeman, Cassandra Deck-Brown, Dedric Bond, Roger Hawley, Martin Brock, Derick Proctor, Tito Fink, The City of Raleigh and Wake County Government
Case Number: 5:2023cv00219
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 48 U.S.C. ยง 1985 Conspiracy/Deprivation Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Dedric Bond waiver sent on 5/30/2023, answer due 7/29/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
June 14, 2023 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Cassandra Deck-Brown waiver sent on 5/30/2023, answer due 7/29/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
June 9, 2023 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #11 Amended Complaint. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 9, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant the City of Raleigh's Motion for Extension of Time #21 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including June 24, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #11 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/9/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
June 8, 2023 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Curran O'Brien on behalf of Lorrin Freeman. (O'Brien, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2023 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Lorrin Freeman waiver sent on 6/7/2023, answer due 8/6/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
May 24, 2023 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by The City of Raleigh (Choi, Hunt)
May 24, 2023 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #11 Amended Complaint,,, filed by The City of Raleigh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Choi, Hunt)
May 24, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Hunt K. Choi on behalf of The City of Raleigh. (Choi, Hunt)
May 23, 2023 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Erik A. Hooks waiver sent on 5/16/2023, answer due 7/15/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
May 23, 2023 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Tito Fink waiver sent on 5/16/2023, answer due 7/15/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
May 23, 2023 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Derick Proctor waiver sent on 5/16/2023, answer due 7/15/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
May 23, 2023 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Martin Brock waiver sent on 5/16/2023, answer due 7/15/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
May 23, 2023 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Roger Hawley waiver sent on 5/16/2023, answer due 7/15/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
May 23, 2023 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Monica Faith Ussery. Roy Cooper waiver sent on 5/16/2023, answer due 7/15/2023. (Biller, Anthony)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Seal #1 Complaint - Exhibits 3 and 8. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/15/2023. (Stouch, L.)
May 12, 2023 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #8 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, Exhibits 3 and 8. (Sellers, N.)
May 11, 2023 Filing 12 Summonses Reissued as to Dedric Bond, Martin Brock, Roy Cooper, Cassandra Deck-Brown, Tito Fink, Lorrin Freeman, Roger Hawley, Erik A. Hooks, Derick Proctor, The City of Raleigh. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
May 1, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Monica Faith Ussery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: EO121-Stay at Home Order 3, #2 Exhibit 2: Incident Report, #3 Exhibit 3: Statement of Charges, #4 Exhibit 4: Daniel Britt Letter, #5 Exhibit 5: WRAL- RPD tweet, #6 Exhibit 6: Biller Letter to Gov. Cooper, #7 Exhibit 7: Reopen NC Demand Letter Response, #8 Exhibit 8: Satement of Charges, #9 Exhibit 9: Letter to DA, #10 Proposed Summons City of Raleigh, #11 Proposed Summons Deck-Brown, #12 Proposed Summons Dedric Bond, #13 Proposed Summons Derick Proctor, #14 Proposed Summons Erik Hooks, #15 Proposed Summons Lorrin Freeman, #16 Proposed Summons Martin Brock, #17 Proposed Summons Roger Hawley, #18 Proposed Summons Roy Cooper, #19 Proposed Summons Tito Fink) (Biller, Anthony)
April 27, 2023 Filing 10 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,,,, Exhibit 8 by Monica Faith Ussery (Banks, Adam)
April 27, 2023 Filing 9 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,,,, Exhibit 3 by Monica Faith Ussery (Banks, Adam)
April 27, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,,,, Exhibits 3 and 8 filed by Monica Faith Ussery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Seal) (Banks, Adam)
April 25, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony J. Biller on behalf of Monica Faith Ussery. (Biller, Anthony)
April 25, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by James R Lawrence, III on behalf of Monica Faith Ussery. (Lawrence, James)
April 25, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Adam Patterson Banks on behalf of Monica Faith Ussery. (Banks, Adam)
April 25, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dedric Bond, Martin Brock, Roy Cooper, Cassandra Deck-Brown, Tito Fink, Lorrin Freeman, Roger Hawley, Erik A. Hooks, Derick Proctor, The City of Raleigh, Wake County Government. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division - This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 5:23-CV-219-BO-RJ. No further filing shall be made in 4:23-CV-69-BO-RJ. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/24/2023. (Stouch, L.)
April 24, 2023 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-9] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-10 through 1-20] Proposed Summons, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
April 24, 2023 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
April 24, 2023 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Monica Faith Ussery (Banks, Adam)
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dedric Bond, Martin Brock, Roy Cooper, Cassandra Deck-Brown, Tito Fink, Lorrin Freeman, Roger Hawley, Erik A. Hooks, Derick Proctor, The City of Raleigh ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7052495.), filed by Monica Faith Ussery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1. Stay-at-home Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Incident Report, #3 Exhibit Statement of Charges (Temporarily SEALED as it contains personal identifiers), #4 Exhibit Daniel Britt Ltr., #5 Exhibit RPD Tweet, #6 Exhibit Biller ltr. to Cooper, #7 Exhibit ReOpen Demand, #8 Exhibit Statement of Chargers (Temporarily SEALED as it contains personal identifiers), #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons Sum. Raleigh, #11 Proposed Summons Sum. Dec-Brown, #12 Proposed Summons Sum. Proctor, #13 Proposed Summons Sum. Hooks, #14 Proposed Summons Sum. Free Mgr., #15 Proposed Summons Sum. Free, #16 Proposed Summons Sum. Brock, #17 Proposed Summons Sum. Hawley, #18 Proposed Summons Sum. Cooper, #19 Proposed Summons Sum. Bon, #20 Proposed Summons Sum. Fink) (Banks, Adam) Modified on 4/26/2023 to temporarily seal attachments #3 and #8 as they contain personal identifiers. (Stouch, L.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ussery v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Faith Ussery
Represented By: Anthony J. Biller
Represented By: James R Lawrence, III
Represented By: Adam Patterson Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik A. Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorrin Freeman
Represented By: Elizabeth Curran O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Deck-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedric Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derick Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tito Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Raleigh
Represented By: Hunt K. Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake County Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?