McClure v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lloyd Calvin McClure
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 5:2023cv00287
Filed: June 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Wanda D. Mason on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Mason, Wanda)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to continue management of the case under the Supplemental Rules for Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 6/12/2023. (Collins, S.)
June 12, 2023 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE SERVICE - This action is governed by the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Pursuant to Supplemental Rule 3, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate office within the Social Security of the General Counsel and the United States Attorneys Office of this case and Plaintiffs complaint. No summons will issue. Defendants deadline to serve an answer or motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is governed by Supplemental Rule 4. (Collins, S.)
June 12, 2023 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lloyd Calvin McClure (Dalton, Aaron)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Aaron Lee Dalton on behalf of Lloyd Calvin McClure. (Dalton, Aaron)
May 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lloyd Calvin McClure. (Dalton, Aaron)
May 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lloyd Calvin McClure. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dalton, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Calvin McClure
Represented By: Aaron Lee Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Wanda D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?