Furman et al v. Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Furman and Lauren Furman
Defendant: Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC and Jared Haims
Case Number: 5:2023cv00326
Filed: June 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Swank
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jason Haselkorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Haselkorn, Jason)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/17/2023. (Sellers, N.)
July 14, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Pickett, Charles)
July 14, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, Jared Haims. (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
July 12, 2023 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
July 10, 2023 Notice to Counsel regarding: #15 Notice of Special Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out-of-district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Sellers, N.)
June 30, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Rayford K. Adams, III on behalf of David Furman, Lauren Furman. (Adams, Rayford)
June 30, 2023 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lauren Furman (Adams, Rayford)
June 30, 2023 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by David Furman (Adams, Rayford)
June 30, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Rayford K. Adams, III on behalf of David Furman, Lauren Furman. (Adams, Rayford)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. All Defendants answer due 7/14/2023. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/23/2023. Copy sent via US Mail to Rayford K. Adams of Spilman Thomas & Battle, PLLC at 110 Oakwood Dr., Suite 500, Winston Salem, NC 27103; Charles L. Pickett of Charles L. Pickett, P.A. at 1758 Lakefront Blvd., Fort Pierce, FL 34982 and Jason S. Haselkorn of Haselkorn & Thibaut, P.A. at 790 Juno Ocean Walk, Suite 501, Juno Beach, FL 33408. (Stouch, L.)
June 23, 2023 Filing 10 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel, Rayford K. Adams of Spilman Thomas & Battle, PLLC at 110 Oakwood Dr., Suite 500, Winston Salem, NC 27103; Charles L. Pickett of Charles L. Pickett, P.A. at 1758 Lakefront Blvd., Fort Pierce, FL 34982 and Jason S. Haselkorn of Haselkorn & Thibaut, P.A. at 790 Juno Ocean Walk, Suite 501, Juno Beach, FL 33408 mailed via US Mail on June 23, 2023. (Rudd, D.)
June 23, 2023 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
June 22, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Sarah L. Tufano on behalf of Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, Jared Haims. (Tufano, Sarah)
June 22, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Carolyn G. Nussbaum on behalf of Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, Jared Haims. (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
June 20, 2023 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, Jared Haims. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Raynal, Charles)
June 16, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Corri Ann Hopkins on behalf of Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, Jared Haims. (Hopkins, Corri)
June 16, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles E. Raynal, IV on behalf of Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, Jared Haims. (Raynal, Charles)
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jared Haims (Raynal, Charles)
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESL Investment Services, LLC, Corporate Parent ESL Federal Credit Union for Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC. (Raynal, Charles)
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 Declaration regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Declaration of Arline Bayo Santiago by Jared Haims, Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC filed by Jared Haims, Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate Information on Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Corporate Information on ESL Investment Services, #3 Exhibit C - Information on ESL Credit Union) (Raynal, Charles)
June 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jared Haims, Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC from Johnston County Superior Court, case number 23cv003067-500. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7142531), filed by Jared Haims, Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of State Court File, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service as to Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC, #6 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service as to Jared Haims, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplement Removal Cover Sheet) (Raynal, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furman et al v. Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Furman
Represented By: Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr
Represented By: Jason Haselkorn
Represented By: Rayford K. Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Furman
Represented By: Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr
Represented By: Jason Haselkorn
Represented By: Rayford K. Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper/Haims Advisors LLC
Represented By: Corri Ann Hopkins
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: Sarah L. Tufano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Haims
Represented By: Corri Ann Hopkins
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: Sarah L. Tufano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?