Gibson v. North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services, et al
Plaintiff: Sabrina Gibson
Defendant: Gregory Ford, North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services, John Does 1-10 and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2024cv00029
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 20 Notice of Change of Address filed by Sabrina Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S)
February 28, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services. (Hunt, Eric)
February 28, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #12 MOTION to Stay filed by United States of America. (O'Hale, Katharine)
February 21, 2024 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by United States of America. (O'Hale, Katharine)
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services. (Hunt, Eric)
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services. (Hunt, Eric)
February 15, 2024 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Sabrina Gibson. (Collins, S)
February 15, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Sabrina Gibson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S)
February 7, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Sabrina Gibson. (Collins, S)
February 7, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Sabrina Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S)
January 24, 2024 Filing 10 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Sabrina Gibson as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 2/17/2024. (Collins, S)
January 24, 2024 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services. (Hunt, Eric)
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services. (Hunt, Eric)
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric R. Hunt on behalf of North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services. (Hunt, Eric)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support regarding #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Declaration) (O'Hale, Katharine)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by United States of America. (O'Hale, Katharine)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Katharine Paige O'Hale on behalf of Gregory Ford. (O'Hale, Katharine)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to to file a Notice of Self-Representation and Financial Disclosure Statement along with blank forms mailed via US Mail to Sandra Gibson at 32 Carmine Place, Hampton, VA 23666. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2024 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 17, 2024 Filing 2 Notice filed by Gregory Ford Certification of Scope of Employment and Substitution. (O'Hale, Katharine)
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gregory Ford from Cumberland County District Court, case number 23CVS6631., filed by Gregory Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint from Cumberland County Clerk of Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #4 Letter to Cumberland County Clerk dated January 17, 2024) (O'Hale, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ford
Represented By: Katharine Paige O'Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Office of Emergency Medical Services
Represented By: Eric R. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Katharine Paige O'Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?