BD Restoration, LLC v. Crom, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BD Restoration, LLC
Defendant: Crom, LLC, The Crom Corporation of America and CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC
Case Number: 5:2024cv00096
Filed: February 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Brian S Meyers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC, Crom, LLC, The Crom Corporation of America. (Walker, William)
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC, Crom, LLC, The Crom Corporation of America. (Walker, William)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed as to #1 Notice of Removal. CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC, Crom, LLC, and The Crom Corporation of America's answers due 4/1/2024. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/6/2024. Copy sent via US Mail to Suzanne R. Walker & Kaitlin Romanelli Myers of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, 150 Fayetteville St., Suite 1120, Raleigh, NC 27601 (Stouch, L.)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed filed by CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC, Crom, LLC, The Crom Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint) (Walker, William)
March 6, 2024 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed. (Stouch, L.)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint regarding #1 Notice of Removal. All Defendants' answer due 3/11/2024. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/22/2024. Copy sent via US Mail to Suzanne R. Walker & Kaitlin Romanelli Myers of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, 150 Fayetteville St., Suite 1120, Raleigh, NC 27601. (Stouch, L.)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Crom Corporation of America (Walker, William)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Crom, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Crom Corporation of America, Corporate Parent Crom Holdings, LLC for Crom, LLC. (Walker, William)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC (Walker, William)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by William Otis Walker, IV on behalf of CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC, Crom, LLC, The Crom Corporation of America. (Walker, William)
February 22, 2024 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel, Suzanne R. Walker & Kaitlin Romanelli Myers of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, 150 Fayetteville St., Suite 1120, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on February 21, 2024. (Rudd, D.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC, Crom, LLC, The Crom Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Walker, William)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Harold Arthur Bolick, II on behalf of All Defendants. (Bolick, Harold)
February 21, 2024 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 19, 2024 Filing 2 Notice filed by CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC, Crom, LLC, The Crom Corporation of America (Notice that Petition for Removal Has Been Filed in State Court). (Walker, William)
February 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wake County Superior Court, case number 24 CVS 1206-910. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7481283), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Summonses and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Lien and Bond Documentation, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Walker, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BD Restoration, LLC v. Crom, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BD Restoration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crom, LLC
Represented By: William Otis Walker, IV
Represented By: Harold Arthur Bolick, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Crom Corporation of America
Represented By: William Otis Walker, IV
Represented By: Harold Arthur Bolick, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CI NC Student Housing Leaseco, LLC
Represented By: William Otis Walker, IV
Represented By: Harold Arthur Bolick, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?