The Phoenix Insurance Company v. PHD Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Defendant: PHD Energy, Inc. and Flock Group Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv00151
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. PHD Energy, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2024, answer due 5/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant PHD Energy, Inc's Waiver of the Service of Summons) (Nalibotsky, Albert)
April 10, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Anderson Herman Phillips on behalf of PHD Energy, Inc.. (Phillips, Anderson)
April 10, 2024 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website, #www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
April 3, 2024 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Flock Group Inc. (Doyle, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey A. Doyle on behalf of Flock Group Inc.. (Doyle, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Flock Group Inc.. (Doyle, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. Flock Group Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Flock Group Inc., PHD Energy, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Mann, Stephanie)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 5:24-CV-151-D-RJ. No further filing shall be made in 4:24-CV-33-D-RJ. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/7/2024. (Mann, Stephanie)
March 7, 2024 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 03/07/2024. Case Number 4:24-cv-33-D-RJ. (Mann, Stephanie)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 5:24-CV-121-D-RJ. No further filing shall be made in 4:24-CV-33-D-RJ. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/6/2024. (Mann, Stephanie)
March 6, 2024 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Phoenix Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Albert S. Nalibotsky on behalf of The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Nalibotsky, Albert)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7503652.), filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons PHD Energy, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Flock Group Inc.) (Nalibotsky, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Phoenix Insurance Company v. PHD Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Albert S. Nalibotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHD Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Anderson Herman Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flock Group Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?