Frannicola et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arthur J Frannicola and Joy A Frannicola
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC, Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC
Case Number: 5:2024cv00206
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by RRA 2 CP, LLC. (Patel, Nishma)
May 31, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Patel, Nishma)
May 8, 2024 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Second Motion for Extension of Time #13 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including May 31, 2024, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/8/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
May 7, 2024 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S)
May 6, 2024 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by RRA 2 CP, LLC, Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Patel, Nishma)
April 16, 2024 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by RRA 2 CP, LLC (Patel, Nishma)
April 16, 2024 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Real Time Group, Inc. for Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Patel, Nishma)
April 16, 2024 Filing 10 Notice filed by RRA 2 CP, LLC, Real Time Resolutions, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Exhibit A (Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint). (Patel, Nishma)
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Joy A Frannicola (Frost, Joseph)
April 11, 2024 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Arthur J Frannicola (Frost, Joseph)
April 11, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Z. Frost on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Frost, Joseph)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint (Unopposed), #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/10/2024. Copy sent to Joseph Z. Frost at Buckmiller Boyette & Frost, PLLC, 4700 Six Forks Road, Suite 150, Raleigh, NC 27609 (Collins, S)
April 10, 2024 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel of requirement to file a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Joseph Z. Frost at Buckmiller Boyette & Frost, PLLC, 4700 Six Forks Road, Suite 150, Raleigh, NC 27609 (Collins, S)
April 10, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Exhibit A is an illegible or improperly formatted document. Exhibits should be scanned as single pages. Counsel is directed to refile using the event "Notice-Other". Further counsel is reminded to label any exhibits attached to pleadings pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). (Collins, S)
April 10, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Correct Financial Disclosure Statement as to Defendants RRA 2 CP, LLC, Real Time Resolutions, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S)
April 10, 2024 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint (Unopposed). (Collins, S)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Patel, Nishma)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Real Time Group, Inc. for Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC. (Patel, Nishma)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Nishma Patel on behalf of Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC. (Patel, Nishma)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC from Superior Court for Johnston County, North Carolina, case number 24CV000501-500. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 6945205) (Attachments: #1 Amended at DE10 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Patel, Nishma) Modified on 4/17/2024 (Collins, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frannicola et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur J Frannicola
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy A Frannicola
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and RRA 2 CP, LLC
Represented By: Nishma Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Represented By: Nishma Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRA 2 CP, LLC
Represented By: Nishma Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?