VERONA et al v. U.S. BANCORP et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN VERONA, MYGALLONS LLC and ZENACON LLC
Defendant: U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK VOYAGER FLEET SYSTEMS INC. and K.E. AUSTIN CORP.
Case Number: 7:2009cv00057
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion for Bill of Costs and granting in part and denying in part 244 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 3/29/2013. (Marsh, K)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 276 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/19/2012. (Marsh, K)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER denying 242 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 2/6/2012. (Marsh, K)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting 236 Motion to Stay. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 12/14/2011. (Marsh, K)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff MyGallons, LLC and counter claimant Voyager Fleet Systems, Inc. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 10/18/2011. (Marsh, K) Modified on 10/18/2011 (Marsh, K).
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 82 Motion in Limine To Exclude Proposed Expert Testimomy, granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 163 Motion to Strike, granting 164 Motion to Seal Document, granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion to Seal, and granting 168 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 3/29/11. (Cress, L.)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying 95 Motion to Seal; denying 115 Motion to Seal; denying 119 Motion to Seal; denying 131 Motion to Seal; denying 146 Motion to Seal. All pending motions to seal are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Counsel should review the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Judge W. Earl Britt on 8/27/10. (Cress, L.)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 25 IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE 26 IS GRANTED AND THE CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1631 AND 1404 IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/23/09. 2/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/2/2009.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VERONA et al v. U.S. BANCORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN VERONA
Represented By: SHERRIE R. SAVETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYGALLONS LLC
Represented By: SHERRIE R. SAVETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZENACON LLC
Represented By: SHERRIE R. SAVETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANCORP
Represented By: JOEL MATTHEW WERTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK VOYAGER FLEET SYSTEMS INC.
Represented By: JOEL MATTHEW WERTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.E. AUSTIN CORP.
Represented By: Michael Murchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?