September 12, 2017 |
Filing
84
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Susan K. Edwards for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/12/2017. (Edwards, S.)
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing
78
JUDGMENT in favor of Sharon Southwood against CCDN, LLC, R.K. Lock & Associates, Colleen Lock, Philip M. Manger, Robert K Lock, Jr. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 9/26/2016. (Edwards, S.)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations regarding 69 Memorandum and Recommendations. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reopen the Taylor Action, No. 7:09-CV-183-F. Plaintiffs Southwood, Taylor, Harrison and Hunt shall each submit a Notice of Election of Remedy no later than April 22, 2016. The court will direct the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly pending the filing of the notice of the election of remedies. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 4/7/2016. (Edwards, S.)
|
January 27, 2015 |
Filing
57
ORDER denying without prejudice 56 Motion: RESPONSE to Order regarding 54 Order on Motion to Certify Class, and Motion to Set Jury Trial. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a motion for default judgment on or before March 1, 2015. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/26/2015. (Edwards, S.)
|
March 27, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER denying 34 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice to renew in 60 days. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file an entry of default as to Defendant Philip Manger. The Court in its discretion consolidates cases 7:09-cv-81-F and 7:09-cv-183-F. Each filing shall continue to reflect case numbers 7:09-cv-81-F and 7:09-cv-183-F, but shall be filed only in the consolidated action. The Motion to Certify Class [DE-96] filed in 7:09-cv-183-F is DENIED without prejudice to renew in 60 days. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/27/2014. (Grady, B.)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER denying 48 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant Manger has 30 days to file his Answer and his response to the Motion to CertifyClass. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter default as to Defendants Robert K. Lock, Colleen Lock, R.K. Lock & Associates, and CCDN, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/30/2013. (Edwards, S.)
|
October 23, 2012 |
Filing
46
ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Receiver; denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Receiver; denying 32 Motion to Appoint Receiver; granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen A. Dunn terminated; denying 41 Motion to Appoint Receiver; granting 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion to Expedite; granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss. Remaining individual defendants must cause new counsel to file wit hin (30) days of this order a notice of appearance or advise the court of their intention to proceed pro se. Defendants CCDN LLC and R.K. Lock & Associates must cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance within (30) days of this order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 10/23/2012. Copies served via US Mail to the individuals as listed in the order. (Edwards, S.)
|