Williams v. Georgia Pacific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Henry Johnson Williams
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation, Rex Hiers and Kelly Palmer
Case Number: 7:2010cv00103
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: COLUMBUS
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered December 29, 2010, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that this action is dismissed. The plaintiff shall have and recover nothing from this action. Signed by Clerk of Court on 12/30/2010. Copies served. (Baker, C.)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 9 Memorandum and Recommendations - Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/29/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint filed by Henry Johnson Williams - Objections to M&R due by 12/6/2010. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 11/19/2010. Copies served. (Attachments: # 1 M&R Notice) (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Georgia Pacific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Johnson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Hiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?