Kelly et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: Morgan Kelly, Pamela Kelly and Terry Kelly
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 7:2010cv00172
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated wit hin forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice on or before April 14, 2016. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/29/2016. (Baker, C.)
January 14, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Joint Motion for Court-Hosted Settlement Conference - This case is referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates for purposes of scheduling a Court-Hosted settlement conference pursuant to Local Rule 101.2. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/14/2016. (Baker, C.)
September 25, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/25/2014. (Baker, C.)
August 18, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion to Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/18/2014. (Baker, C.)
September 23, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and adopting 80 Memorandum and Recommendation - In accordance with the court's case management order issued February 25, 2011, and subsequently amended, the parties shall file a supplemental report within ten (10) days from date of entry of this order as to any need for additional discovery and suggested case deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/23/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 30, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Seal Document - It is hereby ORDERED that the document, DE # 58-2, previously filed in this action shall be and remain SEALED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/29/2012. (Baker, C.)
March 14, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Compel and 47 Motion to Compel - Plaintiffs' motions for oral argument are denied. Where plaintiffs' motions are granted, defendant shall serve the discovery to be produced with in fourteen (14) days of entry of this order, unless otherwise agreed upon by the parties. The parties shall submit joint report proposing scheduling matters no later than twenty-one (21) days from date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/14/2012. (Baker, C.)
August 11, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Hearing and granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Strike - Plaintiffs' motion to strike affirmative defenses is ALLOWED as to the fourth affirmative defense. As to the seventh affirmative defense, plai ntiffs' motion to strike is ALLOWED as to the minor's waiver of her own claims. Attempted defense on this basis is not supported under law. Affirmative defense persists however, at to the mother's waiver of the minor's claims. Plaintiffs' motion to strike is DENIED in this remaining part. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/10/2011. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Kelly
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kelly
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Kelly
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?