Taylor v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, et al
Plaintiff: |
S. Douglas Taylor, MD |
Defendant: |
Health Net Federal Services LLC and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
Case Number: |
7:2011cv00268 |
Filed: |
December 20, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
ONSLOW |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. § 551 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 19, 2014 |
Filing
94
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's orders entered November 26, 2012 and March 19, 2014, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that all claims arising in this case are dismissed. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 03/19/2014. (Baker, C.)
|
January 18, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting 48 Motion to Remand - The court hereby GRANTS defendant's motion, VACATES the final order of TRICARE in this matter, and REMANDS to the agency for further proceedings. The agency has sixty (60) days from the date of this order to issue a new final order pursuant to 32 C.F.R. § 199.10. Within fourteen (14) days of such final agency order, the parties are instructed to file a notice of decision and joint status report with this court. This court further reminds defendan t of its November 26, 2012, order, which provides additional guidance to the agency. All other pending motions in this case are DISMISSED as moot, without prejudice. Subsequent to the issuance of a new final order from the agency, the parties are invited to renew any matters still pending pursuant to the local rules. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/18/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER denying 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting 37 Motion For Exemption From Discovery regarding 36 Initial Order - Plaintiff and Defendant United States now shall confer and tender to the court a proposed consent order within fourteen (14) days from date of entry of this order, setting forth agreed upon deadlines for provision of the administrative record and filing of dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/26/2012. (Baker, C.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?