Jacobs v. Robeson County Public Library, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sherryl Lynn Jacobs
Defendant: Robert F. Fisher, Horace Stacy, Gayle McLean, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas, Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library and Robeson County Public Library
Case Number: 7:2012cv00020
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ROBESON
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 51 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Robeson County Public Library, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
February 12, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated within forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before Friday, March 29, 2013. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/12/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 29, 2013 48 RESPONSE to Motion regarding 46 MOTION Appearance by telephone filed by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Grady, B.)
January 28, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Modify Mediation Attendance Requirement - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/28/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 28, 2013 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - 46 MOTION to Modify Mediation Attendance Requirement. (Baker, C.)
January 28, 2013 46 MOTION to Modify Mediation Attendance Requirement by Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Purcell, William) Modified on 1/28/2013 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.)
January 24, 2013 45 MOTION to Exclude Evidence from Expert Witness by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelopes) (Grady, B.)
January 18, 2013 44 Document titled "Mediation Schedule" by Plaintiff Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Grady, B.)
January 16, 2013 43 RESPONSE to Discovery Request by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Grady, B.)
December 28, 2012 42 SELECTION OF William Mason as mediator (Purcell, William)
October 10, 2012 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF regarding 41 Request for Admissions, Set of Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents - Plaintiff is again reminded, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.1, that discovery materials need not be filed unless ordered or needed by the Court. (Baker, C.)
October 9, 2012 41 REQUEST for Admissions, Set of Interrogatories, and REQUEST for Production of Documents by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (Grady, B.)
September 10, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER adopting 35 Memorandum and Recommendations denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 37 Motion to Quash; and, denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/7/2012. (Baker, C.)
July 5, 2012 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF regarding 39 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures - Plaintiff is reminded, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.1 that discovery materials need not be filed unless ordered or needed by the Court. (Baker, C.)
July 5, 2012 39 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Hartman, M.)
June 11, 2012 38 Memorandum in Opposition regarding 37 MOTION to Quash filed by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Robeson County Public Library, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
June 8, 2012 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - 37 MOTION to Quash/Suppress Evidence and Testimony and 35 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Baker, C.)
May 21, 2012 37 MOTION to Quash/ Supress evidence and testimony by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Hartman, M.)
May 18, 2012 36 RESPONSE regarding 29 Amendment to 4 Complaint filed by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of VA Disability Check, # 2 Envelope) (Grady, B.)
May 18, 2012 35 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 24 First MOTION to Dismiss and 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment - This court RECOMMENDS that the individually-named Defendants' motion to dismiss [DE-24] be denied without prejudice and Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment [DE-30] be denied without prejudice. Objections due by 6/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 05/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Baker, C.)
May 18, 2012 34 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - The parties shall provide joint letter with the court by January 1, 2013, identifying the mediator and the date set for mediation. Discovery due by 2/15/2013. Motions due by 2/25/2013. Jury Trial set for that civil term of court commencing 7/22/2013 in New Bern before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/16/2012. (Baker, C.)
May 14, 2012 33 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Sherryl Lynn Jacobs, Gayle McLean, Robeson County Public Library, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
May 14, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. - 24 MOTION to Dismiss and 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Baker, C.)
May 14, 2012 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - 24 MOTION to Dismiss and 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Baker, C.)
April 27, 2012 32 RESPONSE regarding 29 Document Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Robeson County Public Library, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
April 17, 2012 31 Memorandum in Support regarding 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Grady, B.)
April 17, 2012 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment and RESPONSE to Motion regarding 24 First MOTION to Dismiss by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Letter dated 2/12/2010, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Grady, B.)
April 17, 2012 29 Document: Amendment to 4 Complaint by Plaintiff Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (Grady, B.)
April 10, 2012 28 Featured Case INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/15/2012. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/10/2012. (Baker, C.)
April 4, 2012 27 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Plaintiff. (Baker, C.)
April 3, 2012 26 ANSWER to 4 Complaint by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Robeson County Public Library, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 25 Memorandum in Support re 24 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 24 First MOTION to Dismiss by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 23 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 22 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Horace Stacy. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 21 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gayle McLean. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 20 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert F. Fisher. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 19 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 18 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Robeson County Public Library. (Purcell, William)
April 3, 2012 17 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gayle McLean. (Purcell, William)
March 15, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint - All Defendants' answers due 04/03/2012. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 03/15/2012. (Baker, C.)
March 14, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court - 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Complaint. (Baker, C.)
March 13, 2012 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Complaint by Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (Purcell, William)
March 13, 2012 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Complaint by Horace Stacy (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (Purcell, William)
March 13, 2012 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Complaint by Robeson County Public Library (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (Purcell, William)
March 13, 2012 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Complaint by Gayle McLean (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (Purcell, William)
March 13, 2012 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Complaint by Robert F. Fisher (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order). (Purcell, William)
March 13, 2012 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Complaint by Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Robeson County Public Library, Horace Stacy, Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (Purcell, William) Modified on 3/14/2012 to correct filers associated with entry. (Baker, C.)
March 13, 2012 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Purcell, II on behalf of All Defendants (Purcell, William)
February 24, 2012 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas, Horace Stacy, Gayle McLean and the Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library served on 2/22/2012. (Grady, B.)
February 24, 2012 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Robeson County Public Library and Robert F. Fisher served on 2/22/2012. (Grady, B.)
February 13, 2012 Remark - Certified copy of 3 ORDER forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service with copies of complaint, summonses, waivers of service and USM-285 forms. (Baker, C.)
February 13, 2012 5 Summonses Issued as to Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library, Robert F. Fisher, Gayle McLean, Robeson County Public Library, Horace Stacy, and Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas. (Baker, C.)
February 13, 2012 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs (Attachments: # 1 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Forms). (Baker, C.)
February 13, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 02/13/2012. (Baker, C.)
January 23, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. - 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Baker, C.)
January 19, 2012 2 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Grady, B.)
January 19, 2012 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sherryl Lynn Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint, # 2 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Forms, # 3 Proposed Summonses, # 4 Proposed Waivers, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grady, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Robeson County Public Library, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F. Fisher
Represented By: William R. Purcell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Stacy
Represented By: William R. Purcell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle McLean
Represented By: William R. Purcell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Mellen Stepp Thomas
Represented By: William R. Purcell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors for Robeson County Public Library
Represented By: William R. Purcell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robeson County Public Library
Represented By: William R. Purcell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherryl Lynn Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?