Burch, et al v. Lititz Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: |
Steffanie Burch and William Burch |
Defendant: |
Lititz Mutual Insurance Company |
Counter_defendant: |
Steffanie Burch and William Burch |
Counter_claimant: |
Lititz Mutual Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
7:2012cv00107 |
Filed: |
April 24, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
ROBESON |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 17, 2014 |
Filing
37
ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated wit hin forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before Tuesday, September 2, 2014. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/17/2014. (Baker, C.)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment - Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to breach of contract is DENIED. Defendant's motion for summary judgment regarding bad faith, unfair and deceptive tra de practices, attorney's fees, treble damages and consequential damages is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' breach of contract claim and defendant's counterclaims remain for trial. With regard to the case management order issued September 5, 2012, specifying pretrial activities and necessary trial preparation, the parties are directed to file a joint statement setting forth proposed alternative dates for trial, which statement shall reflect consideration also of whether further settlement activities may be appropriate and if so, timing of same. The joint statement shall be submitted within fourteen (14) days of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/19/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?