Gipson v. Onslow County et al

Plaintiff: Alfred Gipson
Defendant: Onslow County, Onslow County Sheriff's Department, Onslow County Sheriff and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 7:2013cv00044
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ONSLOW
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/5/2014. (Tripp, S.)
August 6, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED in accordance with the court's order entered on August 5, 2014 that defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/6/2014. (Tripp, S.)
March 19, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court has reviewed the record and the governing law. Defendant's motion for summary judgment 49 is GRANTED. The clerk shall close the case. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 3/19/15. (O'Brien, C.) Modified on 3/19/2015 (O'Brien, C.).
March 20, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that in accordance with the courts order entered on August 5, 2014, Defendants motion to dismiss [D.E. 42] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion for summary judgment [D.E. 49] is GRANTED. The clerk shall close the case. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 3/20/15. (O'Brien, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson v. Onslow County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onslow County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onslow County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onslow County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.