Gentile, et al v. Brunswick County Sheriff's Department, et al
Plaintiff: |
Andrew Gentile, Christine Gentile and Redgator Pawn Shop |
Defendant: |
Brunswick County Sheriff's Department, John Ingram, Ryan Newman, Michael Murray, Brunswick County, Western Surety Company and Meredith Everhart |
Case Number: |
7:2013cv00081 |
Filed: |
April 25, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
BRUNSWICK |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 17, 2016 |
Filing
127
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Sanctions and adopting 119 Memorandum and Recommendation as modified - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/17/2016. (Baker, C.)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
99
JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE PERSONNEL RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANDREW GENTILE, DEFENDANT RYAN NEWMAN, DEFENDANT MICHAEL MURRAY, AND OTHER PERSONNEL INFORMATION RELATING TO OTHER DEPUTIES AND OFFICERS OF THE SHERIFF OF BRUNSWICK COUNTY - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/1/2015. (Baker, C.)
|
April 2, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss; and adopting 58 Memorandum and Recommendation - The parties remaining in this case, plaintiffs and defendants Ingram, Murray, Newman, and Western Surety, are DIRECTED to confer and provide a discovery plan for remaining case activities, in accordance with the courts April 30, 2013 initial order on planning and scheduling, within twenty-one (21) days of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/01/2014. (Baker, C.)
|
December 23, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER denying 43 Motion to Strike - The court in its discretion will deny the motion to strike and, alternatively, will allow Plaintiffs to file a surreply by no later than December 30, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/23/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
19
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - The court denies without prejudice the motion to dispense with mediation (DE 17) as untimely. The court sets a deadline of May 31, 2013, for the making of any motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdicti on, insufficiency of process, and/or failure to state a claim. Discovery plan due by June 4, 2013. This case is set for scheduling conference by telephone on June 13, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/30/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?