Merrill v. McCarthy et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Merrill
Defendant: Gina McCarthy, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Kathy Anthony and Suzanne Roberts
Case Number: 7:2014cv00004
Filed: January 6, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ONSLOW
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Motion for Court-Hosted Settlement Conference. The settlement conference shall occur before 29 August 2016. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/13/2016. (Romine, L.)
May 4, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Trial is hereby SET for 29 August 2016. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/4/2016. (Marsh, K)
March 30, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Strike Declaration and Expert Report of Linsey Willis and MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Linsey Willis. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 3/30/2016. (Marsh, K)
June 2, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 6/2/2014. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill v. McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Merrill
Represented By: David H. Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?