Spirakis et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Learning Foundation of Wilmington, Myrtle Beach Commons, LLC, Pegasus Construction & Development, Inc., Georgia Spiliotis, Peter N. Spirakis, Mary C. Spirakis and Nicolaos P. Spirakis |
Defendant: |
United States of America, U.S. Department of the Treasury and The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System |
Case Number: |
7:2014cv00019 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
NEWHANOVER |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Fox |
Nature of Suit: |
Banks and Banking |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1442 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2014 |
Filing
16
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the United States' Motion to Dismiss [DE-4]is ALLOWED. Additionally, Plaintiffs have failed to show cause by the deadline set forth in the July 7, 2014, Order. Accordingly, their claims against the remaining Defendant in this action are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to obey an order of this court. Signed by Jacqueline B. Grady, Deputy Clerk for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court, on 7/28/2014. (Grady, B.)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER granting 4 the United States' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for any claims, or third-party claims asserted against the United States Department of the Treasury or the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. The co urt retains jurisdiction over the remaining claims in this action. Additionally, Plaintiffs counsel, David C. Haar, is ORDERED to, within seven days of the filing date of this order, either (1) file a notice of appearance in accordance with Local Ci vil Rule 5.2, or (2) file a motion to withdraw as attorney of record for plaintiffs. Because Mr. Haar currently is not registered as an electronic filer, any notice of appearance or motion to withdraw must be accompanied by a motion for leave to file in paper form, per Local Civil Rule 5.l(d). Furthermore, Mr. Haar is DIRECTED to register as an electronic filer with this district on or before August 1, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/23/2014. Copy sent to Mr. Haar via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?