April 26, 2021 |
Filing
315
ORDER granting 314 Motion Entry of Agreed Order for payment as to RYAN SANTIAGO - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/26/2021. (Sellers, N.)
|
June 14, 2019 |
Filing
295
ORDER granting 293 Motion for Order allowing U.S. Marshal to Secure Property. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/14/2019. (Sellers, N.)
|
August 31, 2018 |
Filing
268
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Anthony Anders. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/31/2018. (Sellers, N.)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
264
ORDER denying as moot 258 Motion for Entry of Default. The clerk previously entered default as to defendant Anthony Anders on November 19, 2014 [DE-105]. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/13/2018. (Sellers, N.)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing
263
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS in part plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment against defendants Compassionate Home Care Services, Inc., Carol Anders, and Ryan Santiago [D.E. 116] and holds that de fendants are liable under the federal and North Carolina false claims acts. The court enters JUDGMENT against defendants Compassionate Home Care Services, Inc. and Carol Anders, jointly and severally, for $2,173,305.38,against defendants Compass ionate Home Care Services, Inc., Carol Anders, and Ryan Santiago, jointly and severally, for $632,752.89, and against defendant Ryan Santiago for $115,189.92. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that defendants Charlena Bryant and Tammy Thompson were voluntarily dismissed on July 18, 2018 [D.E. 257]. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/8/2018. (Sellers, N.)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing
261
ORDER granting 227 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/24/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
|
June 20, 2018 |
Filing
240
ORDER granting 238 Motion to Seal Document 237 PROPOSED SEALED Document. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/20/2018. (Jenkins, C.)
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
211
ORDER denying 188 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 202 Motion to Strike. The court sets the trial for Thursday, June 21, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., in courtroom one of the Terry Sanford Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. The court anticipates two trial days. If necessary, the court will set and enforce time limits on each side. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/27/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
|
September 11, 2017 |
Filing
198
ORDER denying 192 Motion to Strike ; granting 195 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment by September 25, 2017. If plaintiffs choose to reply, they shall do so by October 2, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/11/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
194
ORDER denying 167 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/8/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
166
ORDER granting 164 Motion to Excuse the United States Attorney's Office Civil Chief and the North Carolina Department of Justice Civil Chief from in-person attendance at the settlement conference scheduled for 25 April 2017to excuse Defendan t Carol Anders from in-person attendance at the settlement conference scheduled for 25 April 2017; granting 165 Motion to Excuse the United States Attorney's Office Civil Chief and the North Carolina Department of Justice Civil Chief from in -person attendance at the settlement conference scheduled for 25 April 2017 to excuse Defendant Carol Anders from in-person attendance at the settlement conference scheduled for 25 April 2017. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/20/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
152
ORDER denying 114 Motion for Sanctions; granting 146 Motion for Leave to File. If the court denies plaintiffs' pending motion for partial summaryjudgment, the court will allow defendants to depose Patricia Meyer before trial. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/2/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing
145
ORDER granting 121 Motion to Seal Document; denying 123 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 132 Motion to Seal; granting 135 Motion to Seal Document; granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting 142 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/18/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing
113
ORDER granting 112 Amended Motion for Leave to Depose Incarerated Defendant Carol Anders. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/16/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing
105
ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting 94 Motion to Amend; granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Entry of Default as to defendants Anthony Anders, Charlena Bryant, and Tammy Thompson. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 11/19/14. (O'Brien, C.)
|
August 11, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER granting 83 Motion to lift the seal with the exception of 74 . Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/9/2014. (Edwards, S.)
|