Pinnix, et al v. SSC Silver Stream Operating Company LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Jackson Pinnix and Warren Ivan Jackson
Defendant: SSC Silver Stream Operating Company LLC and SavaSeniorCare LLC
Case Number: 7:2014cv00161
Filed: August 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 JUDGMENT ON BILL OF COSTS - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/26/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 171 Motion to Seal Document. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/27/2017. (Collins, S.)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/6/2017. (Collins, S.)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that the Plaintiff has established by the preponderance of the evidence that Defendant breached its corporate duties owed to David W. Jackson Sr and that Defendants breach of its corporate duties proximately caused the death of David W. Jackson. Sr. Plaintiff has failed to prove by the preponderance of the evidence that the death of David W. Jackson, Sr, proximately caused by the negligence of Defendant, was grossly negligen t, in reckless disregard of the rights of others, or malicious. Therefore, Plaintiffs are entitled to recover of Defendant in the amount of $13,109.45 in compensatory damages and shall bear interest at the legal rate. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/5/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER - The court GRANTS plaintiffs third motion in limine 115 , and DENIES defendants motion to amend. 122 . At trial, defendant may not present argument concerning decedents contributory negligence. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/26/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - Plaintiffs motion in limine, 93 , is DENIED. Defendants motion to exclude expert testimony of Kate Cogan, R.N. and evidence concerning its safety audit procedures, 92 , is DENIED in these parts. The court HOLDS IN ABEYANCE remaining address of defendants motion to exclude evidence regarding application of reflective tape and yellow paint on the handicap ramp. 92 . Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/25/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 100 Motion To Allow U.S. Marshall's Service to Serve trial Subpoena on Melissa Sullivan. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/18/2017. (Collins, S.)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 68 Motion to Strike Expert Testimony and denying 70 Motion to Strike/Exclude Expert Testimony of Thomas Darrell Owens - The parties promptly shall confer and report to the court mutually agreed upon alternative dates for conduct of trial within 10 days from the date of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/1/2017. (Baker, C.)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Seal Document 74 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/27/2016. (Baker, C.)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Seal Document 60 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/31/2016. (Tripp, S.)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration regarding 40 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/26/2015. (Baker, C.)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 MOTION to be Relieved of Providing HIPAA-Qualified Protective Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/19/2015. (Baker, C.)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Compel and 35 Motion to Seal - Defendant shall produce the Safety Team Committee meeting minutes, toolkit, and completed safety audit forms to the Plaintiffs by August 26, 2015. The parties shall move for a HIPAA-qu alified protective order no later than August 19, 2015. Defendant's Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Response to Motion to Compel (located at DE-33-1; -34) shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 08/05/2015. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnix, et al v. SSC Silver Stream Operating Company LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Jackson Pinnix
Represented By: Stephen J. Gugenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Ivan Jackson
Represented By: Stephen J. Gugenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Silver Stream Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Represented By: Amy E. Oleksa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare LLC
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Represented By: Amy E. Oleksa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?