McGowan et al v. Murphy-Brown, LLC

Plaintiff: Woodell McGowan, Wanda McGowan, Perry Miller, Cartha Williams, Elaine Carlton, Anthony Carlton, Barbara Gibbs, Elvis Williams, Vonnie Williams, Kenneth Carter, LaTonya Carter, Linnill Farland, Sr., Georgia Farland, David Carter, Dreama Carter, James Davis, Sr., Jacqueline Davis, James Davis, Jr., Cathy Pearsall, Tevin Newkirk, Robert Carter and Sabena Carter
Defendant: Murphy-Brown, LLC
Case Number: 7:2014cv00182
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: DUPLIN
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2018 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 98 Motion in Limine. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 6/13/2018. (Edwards, S.)
May 31, 2018 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/31/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
May 29, 2018 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 146 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/29/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
May 24, 2018 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Motion in Limine for a Jury View. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/24/2018. (Edwards, S.)
May 18, 2018 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing in part and denying in part 82 Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Expert Testimony of James Merchant, M.D., Dr. P.H. Signed by Senior US District Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/18/2018. (Stouch, L.)
May 17, 2018 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion in Limine to preclude fear of testimony or to limit expert fear of testimony. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/17/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
November 30, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion to Substitute Party. Dorothy L. Hill added. Daniel I. Miller (Administrator of the Estate of Perry Miller) terminated. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/29/2017. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGowan et al v. Murphy-Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy-Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodell McGowan
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda McGowan
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Miller
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartha Williams
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Carlton
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Carlton
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Gibbs
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Williams
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonnie Williams
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Carter
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTonya Carter
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linnill Farland, Sr.
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Farland
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carter
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreama Carter
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davis, Sr.
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Davis
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davis, Jr.
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Pearsall
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tevin Newkirk
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carter
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabena Carter
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?