S&W Ready Mix Concrete Company, LLC v. Industrial Concrete, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
S&W Ready Mix Concrete Company, LLC |
Defendant: |
Industrial Concrete, Inc., John Hetrick, Universal Construction Company, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and The Continental Insurance Company |
Counter_claimant: |
Industrial Concrete, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
S&W Ready Mix Concrete Company, LLC |
Case Number: |
7:2014cv00208 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
BEAUFORT |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Miller Act |
Cause of Action: |
40 U.S.C. § 270 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
38
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/21/2015. (Baker, C.)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER granting 33 Joint MOTION for Continuance and for Leave to Modify Scheduling Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/07/2015. (Baker, C.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: S&W Ready Mix Concrete Company, LLC v. Industrial Concrete, Inc., et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: S&W Ready Mix Concrete Company, LLC |
Represented By: |
Luther Donald Starling, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Industrial Concrete, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Hetrick |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Universal Construction Company, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: The Continental Insurance Company |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Industrial Concrete, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Melissa Dewey Brumback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: S&W Ready Mix Concrete Company, LLC |
Represented By: |
Luther Donald Starling, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?