Bryant v. Village of Bald Head Island, North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: |
Herbert Bryant |
Defendant: |
Village of Bald Head Island, North Carolina and Calvin R. Peck, Jr. |
Case Number: |
7:2014cv00223 |
Filed: |
October 7, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
BRUNSWICK |
Presiding Judge: |
Malcolm J. Howard |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 23, 2018 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting 104 Motion to Reschedule November 16, 2018 Settlement Conference and Excuse Personal Attendance: The court-hosted settlement conference will be held on Tuesday, November 20, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in the United States Courthouse at 31 0 New Bern Ave., Raleigh, North Carolina. Plaintiff Bryant is excused from personally attending but shall be available by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/22/2018. (Lee, L.) Modified on 10/23/2018 to reflect copy to court services. (Lee, L.).
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
67
Order - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, 37 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument in Opposition, 48 , and plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Length of Response, 62 , ar e DENIED. Defendant Village's Motion for Summary Judgment 41 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Peck and Mitchell's Motion forSummary Judgment, 42 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.. Remaining before the court are the following claims: One and Three, Two, Four, and Seven. . Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 3/30/2017. (Foell, S.)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss: Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims against defendant Peck in his official capacity as Village Manager is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against defen dant Peck are hereby DISMISSED, and the clerk is directed to terminate defendant Peck from this action. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's remaining claims is hereby DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 8/12/2015. (Lee, L.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?