Primrose v. Castle Branch, Inc.
Plaintiff: Claire H. Primrose
Defendant: Castle Branch, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2014cv00235
Filed: October 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Bill of Costs. Defendant Castle Branch, Inc., as the prevailing party, is awarded $1,424.00 in deposition transcript costs pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920(2) and these costs are taxed against plaintiff and shall be included in the judgment. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/15/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the defendant's motion for summary judgment [D.E. 34] is GRANTED. Defendant may file a motion for costs in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's local rules. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 1/3/2017. (Briggeman, N.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2017: # 1 Corrected Judgment (Service names corrected)) (Briggeman, N.).
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER as modified. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/5/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Quash. Please read the order in its entirety for important information and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 3/8/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primrose v. Castle Branch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire H. Primrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Branch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?