Mateo-Evangelio, et al v. Triple J Produce, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Mateo-Evangelio and Jaime Trejo-Cardona
Defendant: Triple J Produce, Inc., Hocutt Brothers, Inc., Judy Hocutt, Joey M. Hocutt, M. Jay Hocutt, Bradley Eatmon, James Michael Hocutt and Hocutt Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2014cv00302
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: WILSON
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/6/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for cy pres distribution; denying 94 Motion for reversion. Pursuant to paragraph five of the settlement agreement in this case, the court DIRECTS that Student Action Wit h Farmworkers (SAF) shall be the recipient of all unclaimed settlement funds, calculated in the manner described and in the time frame set forth herein and in the courts August 1, 2017, consent order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/24/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Seal Documents - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/14/2016. (Baker, C.)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Second Joint MOTION To Approve Notice To FLSA Collective Action Members And To Approve Method For Distributing Notice - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/25/2016. (Baker, C.)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 65 MOTION to Approve Notice to Class and Collective Action Members and to Approve Method for Distributing Notice - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/14/2016. (Baker, C.)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/04/2015. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mateo-Evangelio, et al v. Triple J Produce, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Mateo-Evangelio
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Trejo-Cardona
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple J Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hocutt Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Hocutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey M. Hocutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jay Hocutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Eatmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Michael Hocutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hocutt Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?