Ward v. AutoZoners, LLC
Plaintiff: Keith Ward
Defendant: AutoZoners, LLC
Case Number: 7:2015cv00164
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: COLUMBUS
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Keith Ward against AutoZoners, LLC - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that, by mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, defendant's renewed motion for j udgment as a matter of law is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that, for the reasons set forth in the court's orders dated August 22, 2018, and June 8, 2020, defendant's motion to alter judgment is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff DID establish by a preponderance of the evidence that Christina Atkinson's conduct toward him created a hostile working environment on the basis of his sex, in violation of Title VII of the Civil Righ ts Act of 1964, that defendant knew or should have known of Christina Atkinson's conduct toward him, and that defendant failed to take prompt and adequate action to stop Christina Atkinson's conduct toward him. Plaintiff is entitled to reco ver $100,000.00 in compensatory damages on his Title VII sexual harassment claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff DID NOT establish by a preponderance of the evidence that defendant failed to promote him to a full-time position because he made complaints of sexual harassment, in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Acts of 1964. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff DID establish by a preponderance of the evidence that defendant intentio nally inflicted severe emotional distress on plaintiff by ratifying Christina Atkinson's conduct. Plaintiff is entitled to recover $150,000.00 in compensatory damages on his intentional infliction of emotional distress claim. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/24/2020. (Collins, S.)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 163 Motion for Bond Defendant's Partially Unopposed Motion to Approve Supersedeas Bond, Motion to Stay Pending Appeal - The bond dated January 9, 2019, together with the rider dated February 13, 2019, in the amount of $580,000.00, is approved and execution upon the amended judgment is stayed pending the outcome of the appeal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/19/2019. (Tripp, S.)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 AMENDED JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/24/2018. (Collins, S.)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 140 Motion to Seal Document 135 Response in Opposition to Motion. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/2/2018. (Collins, S.)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 JUDGMENT in favor of Keith Ward against AutoZoners, LLC. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/4/2018. (Collins, S.)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/16/2018. (Collins, S.)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Seal Document 58 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/10/2018. (Collins, S.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs constructive discharge claim is DISMISSED. Plaintiffs claims for retaliation, intentional infliction of emotional distress and hos tile working environment are allowed to proceed. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and file within 21 days from date of entry of this order a joint status report specifying three preferred alternative dates for trial and estimated trial length. Upon receipt of the parties report, the court will enter such further order as is warranted regarding pretrial and trial scheduling. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/5/2017. (Collins, S.)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Unopposed Motion for Exemption of Mediation regarding 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/25/2016. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. AutoZoners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ward
Represented By: Rebecca J. Houlding
Represented By: Laura J. Wetsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZoners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?