Rosinbaum, et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Jo Rosinbaum and Morgan William Robert
Defendant: Flowers Foods, Inc. and Franklin Baking Co., LLC
Case Number: 7:2016cv00233
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the orders entered on December 29, 2020, that the Settlement is fair, reasonable and adequate and the court APPROVES the settlement. Service award payments in the amount of $10,000.00 to Bobb y Jo Rosinbaum and Robert William Morgan, Jr. are APPROVED. Attorneys' fees to Class Counsel in the amount that is equivalent to one-third of the $8.3 million common-fund settlement is APPROVED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiffs' counsel shall be paid $2,766,666.39 in attorney fees and $95,771.40 in expenses. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/29/2020. (Collins, S.)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting 365 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/19/2019. (Collins, S.)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting 308 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/25/2019. (Collins, S.)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting 295 Motion to Stay Discovery and Other Deadlines for Purposes of Mediation. Discovery and other deadlines are stayed until 10/18/18. The parties shall provide the Court with a status update regarding their mediation efforts within 14 days of the mediation scheduled for 9/26/18. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/27/2018. (Collins, S.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 281 Motion to Dismiss non-responding plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/20/2018. (Collins, S.)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER regarding 108 Motion to Compel and 22 Motion to Certify Class Conditional Certification and Judicial Notice - Plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification of one class is GRANTED on the terms set forth in the attached order. Plaintiffs' proposed notice as modified in accordance with this order is APPROVED, and the opt-in period shall extend to May 30, 2017. Defendants are DIRECTED to provide contact information for all potential class me mbers in accordance with this order no later than March 10, 2017. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and file a joint status report on the docket on or before March 10, 2017, consistent with this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/1/2017. (Baker, C.)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 123 Motion to Seal Document - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/23/2017. (Baker, C.)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Motion to Strike 113 Memorandum in Opposition - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosinbaum, et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Jo Rosinbaum
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Leto Copeley
Represented By: Susan E. Ellingstad
Represented By: Ann Groninger
Represented By: Christopher D. Jozwiak
Represented By: Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Represented By: J. Gordon Rudd, Jr.
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Shawn Justin Wanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan William Robert
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Leto Copeley
Represented By: Susan E. Ellingstad
Represented By: Ann Groninger
Represented By: Christopher D. Jozwiak
Represented By: Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Represented By: J. Gordon Rudd, Jr.
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Shawn Justin Wanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Dangel
Represented By: Denise E. Giraudo
Represented By: Margaret Santen Hanrahan
Represented By: Benjamin R. Holland
Represented By: Christopher Eric Humber
Represented By: Lia A. Lesner
Represented By: Lia Anne Lesner
Represented By: Michael J. Murphy
Represented By: Zachary S. Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Baking Co., LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Dangel
Represented By: Denise E. Giraudo
Represented By: Margaret Santen Hanrahan
Represented By: Benjamin R. Holland
Represented By: Christopher Eric Humber
Represented By: Lia A. Lesner
Represented By: Lia Anne Lesner
Represented By: Michael J. Murphy
Represented By: Zachary S. Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?