Locklear v. Old Main Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Genia Locklear
Defendant: Old Main Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2016cv00414
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ROBESON
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J. Howard
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion Requesting Court-Hosted Settlement Conference. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/5/2018. (Stouch, L.)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STAYING CASE through 1 January, 2018. The parties shall file a proposed amended case management order by 16 January 2018 if at that time one or more claims remain pending. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 11/15/2017. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for important information. (Stouch, L.)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 20 Motion Continued stay of the matter pending further amendments to the Case Management Order and granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. A status conference will be held on Wednesday, 15 November 2017, at 3:00p.m. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 11/6/2017. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important information. (Stouch, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locklear v. Old Main Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genia Locklear
Represented By: Deborah N. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Main Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?