HSG, LLC v. Edge-Works Manufacturing Company, et al
Plaintiff: HSG, LLC
Defendant: Edge-Works Manufacturing Company, Albert Gene Higdon, Jr., A G Higdon, LLC and Rebecca A. Higdon
Counter_claimant: Edge-Works Manufacturing Company, A G Higdon, LLC, Albert Gene Higdon, Jr. and Rebecca A. Higdon
Counter_defendant: HSG, LLC
Case Number: 7:2017cv00029
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ONSLOW
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 AMENDED JUDGMENT - In accordance with the court's order entered March 11, 2019, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, the court ENTERS summary judgment against defendant on plaintiff's claim for br each of contract and AWARDS damages in the amount of $6,371.23. The court ENTERS summary judgment against plaintiff on plaintiff's claim for implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in acc ordance with the court's order entered November 25, 2019 that the parties' motions for attorneys' fees are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's motion for bill of cost is GRANTED. Defendant is awarded net attorneys' fees in the amount of $56,876.00, and plaintiff is awarded taxable costs in the amount of $1,616.00. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/25/2019. (Collins, S.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting 209 Motion to Seal 204 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, 196 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, 206 PROPOSED SEALED Reply, 193 PROPOSED SEALED Response, and 195 PROPOSED SEALED Response. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/30/2019. (Collins, S.)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 190 Motion to Seal 174 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, 173 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support, 177 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/3/2019. (Collins, S.)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the court's order entered March 11, 2019, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, the court ENTERS summary judgment against defendant on plaintiff's claim for breach of contract and AWARDS damages in the amount of $6,371.23. The court ENTERS summary judgment against plaintiff on plaintiff's claim for implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/11/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 165 Motion to Seal 160 PROPOSED SEALED Document, 161 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, 163 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/28/2019. (Collins, S.)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 138 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/29/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 152 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/26/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 146 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/17/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 JUDGMENT in favor of HSG, LLC against A G Higdon, LLC, Albert Gene Higdon, Jr. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/17/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Motion to Withdraw Rule 16 Conference; granting 124 Motion entry and sealing of proposed case management order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/3/2018. (Collins, S.)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Motion to Seal - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/4/2018. (Tripp, S.)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 104 Motion to Seal - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/23/2018. (Tripp, S.)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Seal Document. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/16/2017. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Seal Document 48 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, 47 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/22/2017. (Collins, S.)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/18/2017. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSG, LLC v. Edge-Works Manufacturing Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSG, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Varnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edge-Works Manufacturing Company
Represented By: John Ellison Branch, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Gene Higdon, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew C. Coxe
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A G Higdon, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Coxe
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca A. Higdon
Represented By: Matthew C. Coxe
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Edge-Works Manufacturing Company
Represented By: John Ellison Branch, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: A G Higdon, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Coxe
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Albert Gene Higdon, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew C. Coxe
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Rebecca A. Higdon
Represented By: Matthew C. Coxe
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: HSG, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Varnum
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Varnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?