United States of America v. Locklear's Personal Property et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Locklear's Personal Property, A 2008 Chevrolet Silverado and A 2016 Ford F 250 Truck
Case Number: 7:2017cv00143
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ROBESON
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Entry of Default. Default is hereby enteredagainst potential claimants, Brandon Darris Locklear, Kelli Nicole Harris, and Lumbee Guaranty Bank; and against certain defendants, that is, a 2008 Chevrolet Silverado, VIN: for having failed to appear, plead, or otherwise defend as provided by Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/28/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
November 28, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Vacate the Order entered herein on November 13, 2017; granting 13 Motion Interlocutory sale of the 2016 Ford F-250 truck, VIN #1FT7W2BT2GED44572. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/28/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
November 13, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Petititon for Remission Or Mitigation filed by Interested Party Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/13/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Locklear's Personal Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locklear's Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2008 Chevrolet Silverado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2016 Ford F 250 Truck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?