Bellamy v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Marilyn Bellamy
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 7:2017cv00191
Filed: October 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BLADEN
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/5/2019. (Foell, S.)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Marilyn Bellamy against Nancy A. Berryhill. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/19/2019. (Foell, S.)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear by Video Conferencing on 7/12/18, at 1:30 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/31/2018. (Foell, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellamy v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Bellamy
Represented By: Maria Concetta Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?