Cape Fear Public Utility Authority v. The Chemours Company FC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cape Fear Public Utility Authority
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC and E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Case Number: 7:2017cv00195
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting in part 131 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 10/19/2023. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Mann, Stephanie)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 10/11/2019. (Sellers, N.)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER Governing the Exchange of Confidential Material - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 9/19/2019. (Sellers, N.)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER - The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART defendants' motion to dismiss,DENIES defendants' motion to stay, and GRANTS defendants' motion to strike [D.E. 37]. In due course, the court will issue an order expounding on its conclusions. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/26/2019. (Sellers, N.)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER - the court GRANTS plaintiffs' motion for a status conference [D.E. 68] and DENIES plaintiffs' motion to compel a discovery conference [D.E. 51, 66]. The court will hold a status conference at 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, April 25, 2019, in courtroom one of the Terry Sanford Federal Building, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. The court anticipates addressing issues related to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure at the status conference. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/21/2019. (Sellers, N.)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the collection of water samples from the Fayettevile Works Facility - Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/1/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion Plaintiffs' Renewed Joint Motion for a Status Conference. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/7/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Initial Status Conference. The court will hold an initial status conference in all five cases at 10:00 am. on Thursday, January 4, 2018, in courtroom one of the Terry Sanford Federal Building, 310 New Bern Avenue,Raleigh, North Carolina. All deadlines are STAYED pending the status conference. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/7/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cape Fear Public Utility Authority v. The Chemours Company FC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Fear Public Utility Authority
Represented By: William P.H. Cary
Represented By: Joseph A. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Represented By: Jonathan D. Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Represented By: Jonathan D. Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?