Futreal et al v. Enterprise Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Rupert Futreal |
Defendant: |
Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Enterprise Leasing Company - Southeast, LLC, EAN Holdings, LLC, Dustin Ringle and Trues Custom Floor Coverings, Inc |
Case Number: |
7:2018cv00029 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
DUPLIN |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 3, 2019 |
Filing
106
Order - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlemen t not be consummated within 45 days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice on or before June 2, 2019. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/3/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
January 8, 2019 |
Filing
101
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Compel - Within 14 days after entry of this order, the parties will meet and confer in an attempt to agree upon the expenses and attorneys fees that Futreal should rec over for his counsels' work on this motion. If the parties cannot agree, Futreal will file an accounting of its attorneys' fees and costs incurred in pursuing the motion to compel no later than 21 days after entry of this order. Futreal ma y also submit a supporting memorandum of no more than 10 pages with its request. Enterprise may file a response of no more than 10 pages within 14 days after Futreal files his memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 1/7/2019. (Tripp, S.)
|
November 27, 2018 |
Filing
99
ORDER granting 97 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/27/2018. (Collins, S.)
|
July 9, 2018 |
Filing
75
ORDER granting 52 Motion to Seal DE*50 Defendant Ringle's Answer to Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/9/2018. (Collins, S.)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing
24
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Substitute Party. Rupert Futreal, Administrator of the Estate of Elna Futreal added. Elna Futreal terminated. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/16/2018. (Collins, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?