U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Green Tree 2008-HE1 v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Green Tree 2008-HE1
Defendant: Martha L Lewis, Roy Neil Lewis, Kelly Diane Lewis, Clara D. Lewis, Ruby A Bazen and Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 7:2018cv00034
Filed: March 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BRUNSWICK
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DEFAULT ORDER AND JUDGMENT as to Defendants Martha L. Lewis, Roy Neil Lewis, Kelly Diane Lewis, Clara D. lewis, and Ruby A. Bazen formerly known as Ruby Todd Lewis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/7/2019. (Sellers, N.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay. The 120-day stay of discovery deadlines set forth in the Court's Order dated September 7, 2018 [D.E. 15] is extended to 210 days. The United States and the Plaintiff are further ordered to submit a joint status report to the Court on or before the expiration of the 210-day stay. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/20/2018. (Sellers, N.)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay Discovery Deadlines. The 60-day stay of discovery deadlines set forth in the Court's Order dated July 19, 2018 [D.E. 13] is extended to 120 days. The United States and the Plaintiff are further ordered to submit a joint status report to the Court on or before the expiration of the 120-day stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/7/2018. (Sellers, N.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay Discovery Deadlines. The discovery deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order issued on May 11, 2018, are stayed for 60 days. The United States and the Plaintiff are further ordered to submit a joint status report to the Court on or before the expiration of the 60 day stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/19/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Green Tree 2008-HE1 v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Green Tree 2008-HE1
Represented By: Lucas David Garber
Represented By: Ryan P. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha L Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Neil Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Diane Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clara D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby A Bazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Dennis M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?